Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01393
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 12:55 AM MST
Defendant
Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza (1)
Represented By
Maxine Marshall
Marshall Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael E Shaw
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 2:40 AM MST
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
Arrest of Maria Isabelle Vanderpool, Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza on 7/31/2024. (SMF) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Isabelle Vanderpool, Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza. (SMF) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESSES by USA as to Maria Isabelle Vanderpool, Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. (SMF) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza (2) held on 8/2/2024. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds the defendant indigent and appoints CJA Attorney Maxine Marshall as counsel of record. The Government is seeking detention. Defendant waives a formal reading and requests to set a Status Hearing regarding all issues. SO ORDERED as set forth below. The Court waives the presence of the material witnesses at the Status Hearing. Defendant temporarily detained pending further proceedings. SPANISH INTERPRETER REQUIRED FOR DEFENDANT . As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Christine Keller with AUSA Diamond Zambrano on behalf of AUSA Michael Shaw for the Government, CJA Attorney Maxine Marshall for Defendant, and AFPD Ana Botello (potential counsel for Material Witnesses). Defendant is present and in custody, assisted by Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard. Material Witnesses are not present and in custody. Status Hearing re: Detention, Preliminary Hearing, and Material Witness Video Depositions set for 8/9/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey. Related [+] Hearing held 3:20 PM to 3:23 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Initial Appearance for Material Witnesses in case as to Maria Isabelle Vanderpool (1) and Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza (2) held on 8/2/2024. MATERIAL WITNESSES SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds the material witnesses indigent and appoints AFPD Ana Botello as counsel on their behalf. The Court advises the material witnesses of the nature of the proceedings and that they will remain temporarily detained until their depositions can be taken by videotape, if the parties deem necessary. IT IS ORDERED that the Government schedule the video depositions within five (5) working days, but no more than eight (8) working days, from today's date. SPANISH INTERPRETER REQUIRED FOR MATERIAL WITNESSES . Appearances : AUSAs Christine Keller and Diamond Zambrano on behalf of AUSA Michael Shaw for the Government, AFPD Ana Botello for Material Witnesses. Material Witnesses are present and in custody, assisted telephonically by Spanish Interpreter Eduardo Arenas. Related [+] Hearing held 3:45 PM to 3:52 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 8/2/2024. (MRH) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
9 9 MATERIAL WITNESS DETAINMENT ORDER as to Maria Isabelle Vanderpool (1) and Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 8/2/2024. (MRH) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
12 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Detention and Preliminary Hearings and Status Hearing re: Material Witness Video Depositions as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza held on 8/9/2024. Material Witnesses' presence previously waived by counsel. The parties file a Stipulation for the Release of Material Witnesses with the Court. SO ORDERED. Material Witness counsel Ana Botello is excused. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Order to issue. Appearances : AUSA Chong-Ho Chung on behalf of Michael Shaw for the Government, CJA Attorney Maxine Marshall for Defendant, and AFPD Ana Botello for Material Witnesses. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 11:33 AM to 11:50 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
15 15 STIPULATION and Joint Motion for the Release of Material Witnesses by USA as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza. (KGM) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESSES pursuant to15 Stipulation as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza: IT IS ORDERED directing the United States Marshal to release the material witnesses in this action to the Department of Homeland Security for return to their countries of origin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/9/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 8/9/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-09321-ESW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
18 18 INFORMATION - Felony as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza (1) count(s) 1. (RMW)
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza. (RMW)
Related: [-]
20 20 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (RMW)
Related: [-]
21 21 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M Lanham. Filed by USA as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza. (RMW)
Related: [-]
23 23 MINUTE ORDER as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza: This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Alison S. Bachus to conduct a plea hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
Related: [-]
25 25 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Jesus Orlando Corral-Baeza, Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(SMW)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]