Original Case: 4:23-cv-00168

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02872
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 3:16 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Tek Solv
Represented By
Melanie Gravlin
BROWN & JAMES
contact info
Steven Howard Schwartz
BROWN & JAMES
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kevin Jones
Represented By
Kevin Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/04/2025 3:16 AM CST
Friday, September 13, 2024
Civil case docketed. [5435624] 24-2872 (CMH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs ProSe Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs ProSe NDA
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 08/13/2024, ad Judgment 08/13/2024. [5435640] 24-2872 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files.
Transcript due on or before 10/23/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Kevin Jones due 11/04/2024
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5435644] 24-2872 (CMH)
Related: [-]