New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:24-cv-09184
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By
TIFFANY M. ALEXANDER
contact info
Notice Only
PHV NATHAN N. KIYAM
Notice Only
PHV JEFFREY OSTERWISE
Notice Only
PHV CODY R. PADGETT
Notice Only
PHV MAJDI Y. HIJAZIN
Notice Only
PHV JASON R. HODGE
Notice Only
PHV TERRI S. REISKIN
Notice Only
SHAHIN REZVANI
Plaintiff
KENNETH NOWLING
Represented By
ABIGAIL GERTNER
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
NATALIE LESSER
Berger Montague PC
contact info
RUSSELL D. PAUL
Berger Montague PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Notice Only
PHV LAURA E. GOOLSBY
Terminated: 03/03/2025
Notice Only
PHV TAREK H. ZOHDY
Terminated: 03/03/2025


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
53 53 motion Dismiss Wed 04/30 2:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC. Responses due by 5/19/2025.(ALEXANDER, TIFFANY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law with Attachment A,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Tiffany M. Alexander,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 1 to Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 2 to Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 3 to Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration