Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-05047
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Plaintiff
Joel Minor
Represented By
Tate J Kunkle
Douglas And London PC
contact info
Michael A London
Douglas And London PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 16, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Mon 09/16 10:21 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 09/13/2024), Joel Minor v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-05047-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of South Dakota (jbin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11990504.), filed by Joel Minor. Service due by 12/12/2024 (jbin)
Related: [-]