Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-59671

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:24-bk-59729
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Group Resources Incorporated
PO Box 670
Winston, GA 30187-0670
Represented By
Michael D. Robl
Robl Law Group LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Federal Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
Lindsay P. S. Kolba
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
25 25 misc P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE) Mon 05/12 8:04 PM
Amendment to Schedules: Schedule E/F, (creditors added by upload) Fee $ 34 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 05/12 8:04 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules D,E,F and/or E/F (FEE)([LINK 24-59729 sms] ) [misc,729] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A63214765. Fee Amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#25
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 04/22 12:35 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 04/22 12:33 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
22 22 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Sun 03/02 11:28 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
21 21 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 02/28 9:12 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59729 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 01/29 9:56 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59729 for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 filed by Maxwell William Bowen on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Bowen, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 misc 0-Withdrawal of Document Fri 01/17 1:22 PM
Withdrawal of Document filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. Related [+] (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-] 17
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 01/17 11:42 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59729 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 01/17 10:16 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59729 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 01/15 1:32 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-59729 for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/14 5:26 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Petrina McDaniel on behalf of Invest Atlanta. (McDaniel, Petrina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
notice Notice of No Appointment of Creditors' Committee Wed 10/16 12:10 PM
The United States Trustee for Region 21 reports that no committee of creditors holding unsecured claims has been appointed in this case. filed by Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
misc Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Thu 10/17 1:05 PM
Section 341(a) meeting held and concluded. (jar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Thu 10/03 7:07 AM
Notice that the Amended List of Creditors (creditors added by upload) Fee Amount $ 34, Equity Security Holders , Schedules A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor , Amended 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor, Corporate ownership statement(Rule 7007.1) filed by Michael D. Robl is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Supplemental List of Creditors, Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 30+ pgs misc P-Amended List of Creditors (FEE) Mon 09/30 7:24 PM
Amended List of Creditors (creditors added by upload) Fee Amount $ 34,, Amended Equity Security Holders , Amended Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Amended Schedule G , Amended Schedule H , Amended Statement of Financial Affairs , Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor , 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 09/30 7:25 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (FEE)([LINK 24-59729 sms] ) [misc,952] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A61914174. Fee Amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#14
Saturday, September 28, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Sun 09/29 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 09/26 3:47 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural, but notsubstantive, consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases listed below. The docket in case number 24-59671 SMS should be consulted for allmatters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases a jointly administered: Case No. 24-59671 SMS, Case No. 24-59673 SMS, Case No. 24-59675 SMS, and Case No. 24-59729 SMS Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 order Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 09/26 3:44 PM
Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 9/26/2024. (cws)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
misc Hearing Held Tue 09/24 2:51 PM
Hearing Held: Order to be submitted re: Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, September 19, 2024
10 10 20 pgs motion Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 09/19 4:13 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration filed by Maxwell William Bowen on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Bowen, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Thu 09/19 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Thu 09/19 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Thu 09/19 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 misc P-Corporate Resolution Mon 09/16 1:48 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Mon 09/16 1:38 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/30/2024. Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H due by 9/30/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 9/30/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 9/30/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 9/30/2024. Corporate Resolution due 9/30/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 9/30/2024. (cws)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Mon 09/16 1:34 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 9/16/2024. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Mon 09/16 1:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 10/16/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 1:05 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of United States Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/16 12:02 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Michael D. Robl of Robl Law Group LLC on behalf of Group Resources Incorporated. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/14/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/14/2025. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Mon 09/16 1:41 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-59729 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A61823764. Fee Amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1