Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-mc-00102
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Cancelling Motion Hearing Tue 10/15 3:53 PM
NOTICE cancelling 10/22/2024 hearing re Petitioner's Motion for Order to Show Cause1 (jal)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Tue 10/15 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Marin, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Fri 09/27 5:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re Order Regarding Response to Motion,6 (Marin, Diana)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Restricted Access Court Document Fri 09/27 3:28 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Videoconference information for 10/22/2024 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC only] (jln)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Fri 09/27 3:27 PM
ORDER that Respondent shall have 14 days from 9/26/2024 to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Order to Show Cause1 ; Petitioner to serve this Order on Respondent today and file proof of service; hearing on Petitioner's Motion1 set for 10/22/2024 at 2 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) Modified text on 9/27/2024 (jln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/26 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re Order4 , MOTION for order to show cause why an administrative subpoena should not be enforced 1 (Marin, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Certified Mail,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Email Service
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/20 12:16 PM
ORDER that Petitioner serve1 on Respondent and file a proof of service within seven days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 09/17 8:41 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/16 1:00 PM
NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Southern Division civil docket 1:24-cv-955 to the Southern Division miscellaneous docket; all future filings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER 1:24-mc-102 (jlg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Show Cause Mon 09/16 10:14 AM
MOTION for order to show cause why an administrative subpoena should not be enforced by petitioner Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; (Marin, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Director Gutierrez Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Notice of Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 5 Exhibit D February 8, 2023 Termination Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit E Subpoena DT-24-28,
Att: 7 Exhibit F September 4, 2024, EEOC Email to Respondent