Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Camille L Velez-Rive
Case #: 3:24-cv-01427
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:20 AM AST
Defendant
Insurance Company A
Represented By
Sheena S Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Lizza Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Hunter Walker
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
S. Jonathan Vine
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Insurance Company B
Represented By
Sheena S Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Lizza Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Hunter Walker
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
S. Jonathan Vine
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence L. Klayman
Represented By
Sheena S Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Lizza Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Hunter Walker
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
S. Jonathan Vine
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Klayman & Toskes, P.A.
Represented By
Sheena S Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Lizza Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Hunter Walker
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
S. Jonathan Vine
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Steven Toskes
Represented By
Sheena S Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Lizza Maldonado
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Dmr Law
contact info
Maria A. Dominguez-Victoriano
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Hunter Walker
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
S. Jonathan Vine
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix M. Aviles-Franco
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Becker & Vissepo
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynette Castillo
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Becker & Vissepo
contact info
Plaintiff
Conjugal Partnership Aviles-Castillo
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Becker & Vissepo
contact info
Plaintiff
Personnel Recruiting Service, Corp.
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Becker & Vissepo
contact info
Plaintiff
Racquel Jimenez
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Jimenez
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimenez Conjugal Partnership
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvador Jimenez Individual Retirement Account
Represented By
Luis E. Minana
Luis E. Minana & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
68 68 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/19 5:18 PM
ORDER granting67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to59 Memorandum in Opposition. Defendants are granted leave to file a Reply Brief by 6/2/2025. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 05/19/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/19 4:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to59 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Personnel Recruiting Service, Corp., Felix M. Aviles-Franco, Jimenez Conjugal Partnership, Racquel Jimenez, Salvador Jimenez Individual Retirement Account, Lynette Castillo, Salvador Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Aviles-Castillo filed by Hunter Walker on behalf of Lawrence L. Klayman, Klayman & Toskes, P.A., Steven Toskes. Responses due by 6/2/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Walker, Hunter)
Related: [-] 59
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
66 66 order Order on Motion Submitting Tue 05/13 5:15 PM
ORDER noted65 MOTION Submitting Certified Copies of Documents. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 5/13/2025. (ari)
Related: [-]
65 65 motion Submitting Tue 05/13 5:01 PM
MOTION Submitting Certified Copies of Documents filed by Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Lawrence L. Klayman, Klayman & Toskes, P.A., Steven Toskes. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Rodriguez-Munoz, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
64 64 order Order on Motion Submitting Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/13 9:24 AM
ORDER noted and granting58 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: 55 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for extension of time until May 14, 2023 to Submit Certified Copies. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 5/13/2025. (ari)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
63 63 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 05/12 9:36 PM
ORDER granting61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 05/12/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
62 62 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Mon 05/12 9:35 PM
ORDER granting60 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified translations due on 5/26/2025. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 05/12/2025. (CVR)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion File Excess Pages Mon 05/12 9:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
Related: [-]
60 60 motion Leave to File Spanish language documents Mon 05/12 9:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
Related: [-]
59 59 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Mon 05/12 9:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs Re:51 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Klayman & Toskes, P.A., Insurance Company A, Steven Toskes, Lawrence L. Klayman, Insurance Company B filed by All Plaintiffs.(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
58 58 motion Submitting Extension of Time Mon 05/12 5:43 PM
MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: 55 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for extension of time until May 14, 2023 to Submit Certified Copies filed by Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Lawrence L. Klayman, Klayman & Toskes, P.A., Steven Toskes. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Munoz, Julian)
Related: [-] 55
Att: 1 Exhibit DMR_ENG_51-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit DMR_ENG_51-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit DMR_ENG_51-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit DMR_ENG_51-4