Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-03669
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff
Clarence Frost
Represented By
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info
Chad Throndset
Throndset Michenfelder, LLC
contact info
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Frost
Represented By
Patrick W Michenfelder
Throndset Michenfelder Law Office, LLC
contact info
Chad Throndset
Throndset Michenfelder, LLC
contact info
Jason D Gustafson
Throndset & Michenfelder Law Office LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 11/01 3:17 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/01 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost (Michenfelder, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
6 6 misc Letter to District Judge Thu 10/10 1:50 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost . (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/20 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. served on 9/19/2024, answer due 10/10/2024. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 09/18 2:26 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Standing Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/18/2024. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.. (MMG)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 09/17 4:19 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 5th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-3669 JWB/LIB. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11354795) filed by Clarence Frost, Tammy Frost. Filer requests summons issued. (Gustafson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet