New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-09196
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
BOROUGH OF HAWTHORNE
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Defendant
HAWTHORNE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PATROLMAN RYAN DALEY
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PATROLMAN ZACHARY GROCHOWSKI
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Defendant
SERGEANT JAMES HAYES
Represented By
R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR
Semeraro & Fahrney, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES POLICE OFFICERS 1-20
Plaintiff
ESTEBAN MORAN
Represented By
NANCY E. LUCIANNA
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2025
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/18/2025. (wh)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
18 18 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/02 8:50 AM
TEXT ORDER-- Due to a scheduling conflict, the Rule 16 conference currently scheduled for May 27, 2025 is hereby RESCHEDULED for June 9, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. via video conference. Microsoft teams login credentials will be provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 5/2/2025. (JB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/21 11:09 AM
ORDER, an initial scheduling conference shall be held via video conference on May 27, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than five business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 4/21/2025. (JB) Modified on 4/21/2025 (JB, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 11:04 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RYAN DALEY, ZACHARY GROCHOWSKI, JAMES HAYES.(FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/18 4:08 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants'11 Motion to Dismiss. Counts I-XI are dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Hawthorne Police Department and Borough of Hawthorne. Counts I-II and IV-XI are dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Sergeant James Hayes, Patrolman Ryan Daley, Patrolman Zachary Grochowski, and John Doe Police Officers. Count III may proceed as to these Defendants. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/18/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
14 14 10 pgs order Opinion Tue 03/18 4:05 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/18/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
13 13 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 11/11 4:52 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BOROUGH OF HAWTHORNE, JAMES HAYES, RYAN DALEY, ZACHARY GROCHOWSKI, JOHN AND JANE DOES POLICE OFFICERS 1-20, HAWTHORNE POLICE DEPARTMENT re11 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/04 10:14 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ESTEBAN MORAN re11 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/25 12:44 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 11/18/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Thu 10/24 3:42 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 11/4/2024.(FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Counsel with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, October 11, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/11 12:04 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BOROUGH OF HAWTHORNE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/24/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 10/08 11:20 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Extend Time to Answer.. (FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by R. SCOTT FAHRNEY, JR on behalf of All Defendants (FAHRNEY, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 09/25 9:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavits of Service4 ,5 ,6 ,7 ,8 filed by Nancy Lucianna on 9/23/2024 were submitted using the incorrect event. For future reference, if filing an Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and Complaint, please use the event "Summons Returned Executed" found under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, ) Modified on 9/25/2024 (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/23 4:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Borough of Hawthorne on 09/19/2024, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/23 3:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Hawthorne Police Department on 09/19/2024, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/23 3:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on James Hayes on 09/19/2024, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/23 3:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Ryan Daley on 09/19/2024, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/23 3:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Zachary Grochowski on 09/19/2024, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 11:21 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF HAWTHORNE, RYAN DALEY, ZACHARY GROCHOWSKI, HAWTHORNE POLICE DEPARTMENT, JAMES HAYES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
2 2 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 09/16 3:04 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint by ESTEBAN MORAN. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15665792) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ESTEBAN MORAN.(LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 09/16 2:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/16 3:11 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams added. (ps)
Related: [-]