Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03944
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Ronald J Koch
contact info
Counter Defendant
Fast IP, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Kizik Design, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Ronald J Koch
contact info
Plaintiff
Fast IP, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kizik Design, LLC
Represented By
Jared B Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Paul Alan Wolfla
Baker & Daniels LLP
contact info
Andrea I. Savageau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Russell A Kelm
Terminated: 03/05/2025
37 West Broad Street Suite 1060
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Russell Allen Kelm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/05 4:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Counter Defendants Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC, Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC, Mediator Russell A Kelm. (Briant, Jared)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/06 11:17 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
med Notice Designating Mediator Tue 03/04 11:08 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Russell A Kelm assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2025, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
24 24 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Wed 02/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/3/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/12 3:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Edmund A. Sargus no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/12/25. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
22 22 misc Reply (non motion) Mon 12/23 6:40 PM
Reply to Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses by Counter Defendants Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC. (Briant, Jared)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
21 21 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 12/18 3:52 PM
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/18/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
20 20 motion Protective Order Mon 12/16 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC. (Briant, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 11 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 12/03 12:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC. (Koch, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 12/02 2:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2024 is VACATED . Initial Disclosures due by 12/6/2024; Discovery re Claim Construction due by 7/23/2025; Discovery (Fact) due by 11/1/2025; Settlement Demand due by 2/26/2025; Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/5/2025; Case is referred to Mediation in 4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/2/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 11/26 1:47 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT (Joint) by Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC, Defendant Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 10/21 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2024 10:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 5:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC. (Koch, Ronald)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J Koch for Defendant Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC (Koch, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/09 2:46 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea I. Savageau. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/9/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
12 12 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/08 10:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10199285) of Andrea I. Savageau by Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/08 8:27 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jared B. Briant. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/8/2024. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 2:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10196294) of Jared B. Briant by Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/07 12:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC on 10/4/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/17 3:40 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC re1 Complaint, of Filing Exhibits to Complaint (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Patent 10638810,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Patent 10973279
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 5:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Drew Shoe. (sem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form Drew Shoe
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/16 2:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kizik Design, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/16 2:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/16 2:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fast IP, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alan Wolfla for Plaintiffs Fast IP, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tishkoff Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Drew Shoe ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10168146), filed by Fast IP, LLC, Kizik Design, LLC, Handsfree Lab Licensing, LLC. (Wolfla, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Summons Form