Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Steven C Seeger
Case #: 1:24-cv-08491
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Case in other court:Arkansas Western, 5:24-cv-05030
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Circana, LLC
Represented By
Eric J. Maurer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Daniel Robert Stefany
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Mitchell
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Michael S. Mitchell
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Karen P Freeman
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Neil Keith Gilman
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Julie B. Porter
Salvatore Prescott Porter & Porter PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nielsen Consumer LLC
200 West Jackson Boulevard
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Justin Mulligan
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
John Thorne
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel, & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Matthew A Braunel
Thompson Coburn
contact info
Katherine Church Campbell
Friday, Eldredge & Clark
contact info
James M. Webster, III
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Justin Powers Mulligan
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Michael Anthony Parks
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Marshall S. Ney
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Joseph Solomon Hall
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Brendan Matthew Bement
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Circana Group, L.P.
Terminated: 10/18/2024
Represented By
Eric J. Maurer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Mitchell
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Michael S. Mitchell
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Karen P Freeman
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Circana Group, LLC
Terminated: 10/18/2024
Represented By
Eric J. Maurer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Mitchell
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Michael S. Mitchell
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Karen P Freeman
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Circana, Inc.
Terminated: 10/18/2024
Represented By
Eric J. Maurer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Mitchell
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Michael S. Mitchell
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Karen P Freeman
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Information Resources Inc
Terminated: 10/18/2024
Represented By
Eric J. Maurer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Mitchell
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Michael S. Mitchell
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Karen P Freeman
Mitchell Williams Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 5:40 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 2 pgs CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 60 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-2917166), filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC.(Ney, Marshall) (bjb). Modified on 2/2/2024 (bjb). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/2/2024) Unredacted Complaint and Exhibits
3 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Circana Group, L.P. for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Circana Group, LLC for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Circana, LLC for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Circana, Inc. for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Information Resources, Inc. for service of the following document: 2 Complaint. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Exhibits by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
10 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Church Campbell on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for Attorney James M. Webster to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2917204) by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION for Attorney John Thorne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2917211) by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for Attorney Joseph S. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2917231) by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for Attorney Justin Powers Mulligan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2917262) by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
16 16 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
17 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Braunel on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Braunel, Matthew) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
18 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JAMES M. WEBSTER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 1, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
19 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JOHN THORNE is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 1, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
20 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JOSEPH S. HALL is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 1, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
21 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JUSTIN POWERS MULLIGAN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 1, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
22 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Mulligan on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Mulligan, Justin) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
23 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to coordinate with the Clerk's Office to facilitate the filing of the under-seal, unredacted versions of the Complaint and associated Exhibits. To be clear, the sealed, unredacted versions should be uploaded as exhibits to the original Complaint. Further, Plaintiff is advised that the Court intends to compare the unredacted documents to their publicly filed, redacted counterparts to evaluate whether the redactions were necessary and appropriate, given the presumption of public access to Court filings. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 2, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
24 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Circana Group, L.P. served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
25 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Circana, LLC served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
26 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Circana Group, LLC served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
27 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Information Resources, Inc. served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
28 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. Circana, Inc. served on 2/7/2024, answer due 2/28/2024. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
29 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
30 30 26 pgs MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc..(Freeman, Karen)[Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2024-02-23 Tilwani Declaration (Redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - WAS - XNA flight schedules,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - WAS - CHI flight schedules,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - STL - CHI flight schedules
31 31 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
32 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 24, 2024
33 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting31 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 24, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
34 34 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. An Order was entered on 2/24/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to30 Memorandum Brief in Support,. (Freeman, Karen) Modified title and to grant access on 2/27/2024 (lgd). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2024-02-23 Tilwani Declaration (Under Seal)
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
35 35 MOTION for Attorney James P. Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2934457) by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
36 36 MOTION for Attorney Eric J. Maurer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2934463) by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
37 37 MOTION for Attorney Michael S. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2934468) by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
38 38 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JAMES P. DENVIR is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 29, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
39 39 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERIC J. MAURER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 29, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
40 40 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MICHAEL S. MITCHELL is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 29, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
41 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
42 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting41 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff may file a response to the pending motion by March 22, 2024, and Defendants may file a reply by April 5, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 1, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
43 43 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/12/2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 6, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
44 44 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC.(Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Treangen Declaration_REDACTED,
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - Mulligan Declaration,
Att: 3 Ex. 3 - Jurisdictional Discovery_REDACTED
45 45 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
46 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting45 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 22, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
47 47 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER by Nielsen Consumer LLC. An Order was entered on 3/22/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to44 Response to Motion,. (Campbell, Katherine) Modified on 3/25/2024 (bjb). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Treangen Declaration_SEALED,
Att: 2 Ex. 3 - Jurisdictional Discovery_SEALED
Monday, March 25, 2024
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Nielsen Consumer LLC. Response to Motion,44 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: David B. Jinkins, John Thorne, James M. Webster, Joseph S. Hall . (mll) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
48 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mitchell on behalf of Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
49 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James Peter Denvir, III on behalf of Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Denvir, James) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
50 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Maurer on behalf of Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Maurer, Eric) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
51 51 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thorne on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Thorne, John) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
52 52 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Webster, III on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Webster, James) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
53 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Solomon Hall on behalf of Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Hall, Joseph) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
54 54 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
55 55 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING54 Motion for Leave to File Reply Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 5, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
56 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER (REDACTED) filed by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc..(Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Mitchell Declaration with Exhibits 1-5
57 57 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. SEALED DOCUMENT by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. An Order was entered on 4/5/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to56 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
58 58 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
59 59 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Nielsen Consumer LLC.(Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Sur-Reply
Thursday, April 18, 2024
60 60 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting59 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 18, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
61 61 REPLY by Nielsen Consumer LLC re56 Reply to Response to Motion,29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER . (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
62 62 ORDER re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion for Transfer filed by Information Resources, Inc., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana Group, L.P. ( See Order for Specifics ) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 25, 2024. (lgd) Modified on 4/29/2024 to edit text (jlm). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
***CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING set for 4/30/2024 TERMINATED. NOTE: The hearing will be reset by separate order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
63 63 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 7/29/2024 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
64 64 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Merits-Based Discovery by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) Modified on 5/16/2024 (lgd). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
65 65 10 pgs MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of64 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Merits-Based Discovery by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc..(Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Redacted),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Redacted),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit D
66 66 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
67 67 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting66 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 8, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
68 68 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. SEALED DOCUMENT by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc. An Order was entered on 5/8/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to65 Memorandum Brief in Support. (Freeman, Karen) Modified access on 5/9/2024.(mll) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Monday, May 13, 2024
69 69 TEXT ONLY ORDER DIRECTING accelerated response to64 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Merits-Based Discovery . Nielsen's response to the Motion is due by May 15, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 13, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
70 70 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re64 MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Merits-Based Discovery filed by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
71 71 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Stay Merits-Based Discovery Under Seal by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Campbell, Katherine) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
72 72 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting71 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 15, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
73 73 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. SEALED DOCUMENT by Nielsen Consumer LLC. An Order was entered on 5/15/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to70 Response to Motion. (Campbell, Katherine) Modified access on 5/16/2024 (ria). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
74 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 16, 2024. (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
75 75 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc..(Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted)
76 76 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC, Information Resources, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
77 77 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting64 Motion for Protective Order. All merits-based discovery in this case is STAYED. The only discovery that the parties may conduct at this time is limited jurisdictional discovery, as set forth in the Court's prior Order of April 2662 . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 16, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
78 78 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot75 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 16, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
79 79 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot76 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 16, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
80 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Nielsen Consumer LLC. (Ney, Marshall) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
81 81 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting80 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Order62 setting forth a jurisdictional discovery deadline and briefing schedule is hereby amended. The new deadline to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery is July 5, 2024, and the new deadline to file supplementary briefs is July 19, 2024. The case management hearing date remains set for July 29, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 20, 2024. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
82 82 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Nielsen Consumer LLC. An Order was entered on 5/16/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. (Ney, Marshall) Modified to grant access on 7/22/2024.(mll) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 4,
Att: 2 Ex. 5,
Att: 3 Ex. 6,
Att: 4 Ex. 7,
Att: 5 Ex. 8,
Att: 6 Ex. 9,
Att: 7 Ex. 10,
Att: 8 Ex. 11,
Att: 9 Ex. 12,
Att: 10 Ex. 13,
Att: 11 Ex. 14,
Att: 12 Ex. 15,
Att: 13 Ex. 16,
Att: 14 Ex. 17,
Att: 15 Ex. 18,
Att: 16 Ex. 19,
Att: 17 Ex. 20,
Att: 18 Ex. 21,
Att: 19 Ex. 22,
Att: 20 Ex. 23,
Att: 21 Ex. 24,
Att: 22 Ex. 25,
Att: 23 Ex. 26,
Att: 24 Ex. 27
83 83 13 pgs MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER (REDACTED) by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC.(Freeman, Karen) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Redacted),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Redacted),
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
84 84 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Circana Group, L.P., Circana Group, LLC, Circana, Inc., Circana, LLC. An Order was entered on 5/16/2024 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to83 Memorandum Brief in Support. (Freeman, Karen) Modified to grant access on 7/22/2024.(mll)[Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B (UNDER SEAL),
Att: 2 Exhibit C (UNDER SEAL),
Att: 3 Exhibit E (UNDER SEAL)
Friday, July 26, 2024
***CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING set for 7/29/2024 TERMINATED (ongoing criminal jury trial). NOTE: The hearing will be reset by separate order. All deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order remain. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 26, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
85 85 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 9/6/2024 02:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 19, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
86 86 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING (IN PERSON) (parties request): Case Management Hearing reset for 9/9/2024 09:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 27, 2024. (slc) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
87 87 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2024 09:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 9, 2024. (mjm) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
88 88 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2024. COURT'S EXHIBIT #1 - Defendant's Powerpoint Slide Exhibit. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (mjm) Modified on 9/12/2024 (slc). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
89 89 ORDER granting29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue, or, in the alternative, Motion for Transfer; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Northern District of Illinois. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 13, 2024. (ria) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 9/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
90 90 RECEIVED from Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:24-cv-05030 (gcy)
Related: [-]