Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-02680
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Antonio Donis
Represented By
Matthew T. Shea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Memdoza Ur Jaddou
Represented By
Matthew T. Shea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa
Represented By
Anahita Avestaei
Woodward & Avestaei, Pllc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 2:49 PM
Marginal ORDER approving10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 5/12/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/09 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa (Avestaei, Anahita)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 01/03 12:06 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/2/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Shea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 1:45 PM
NOTICE by Antonio Donis, Memdoza Ur Jaddou re3 Amended Complaint, (Shea, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Order Wed 10/02 10:53 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/2/2024. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 10/02 10:43 AM
QC NOTICE:3 Amended Complaint, filed by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa was filed incorrectly. **Summons for the Attorney General and US Attorney was not received. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 9:04 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Antonio Donis, Memdoza Ur Jaddou.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/20 10:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Antonio Donis, Memdoza Ur Jaddou, filed by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa.(Avestaei, Anahita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summon was missing in the original filing,
Att: 2 Summons Summon was missing in the original filing,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover was missing in the original filing
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 09/18 4:37 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa was filed incorrectly. Summons and Civil Cover Sheet not filed. Filed Summons and Civil Cover Sheet using the Notice entry and attached Summons and Civil Cover Sheet. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11493336.), filed by Haimanot Tadesse Wordofa.(Avestaei, Anahita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Asylum receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Biometrics notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Letter