Hoti et al v. Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc., et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jessica G L Clarke |
Referred: | Henry J Ricardo |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-06999 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331cr Fed. Question: Civil Rights (Race Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sal Scognamillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kreshnik Hoti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Desiart Ymeraga
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise Andrea Schulman on behalf of Kreshnik Hoti, Desiart Ymeraga..(Schulman, Denise) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 02/12 12:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo: Settlement Conference held on 2/12/2025. (rdz) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo on February 12, 2025, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 12/20/2024) ( Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo.) (ks) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER:No additional parties may be joined after January 1, 2025 (not including opt-in plaintiffs pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) notice. No amended pleadings may be filed after January 1, 2025. Depositions shall be completed by May 31, 2025. All parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. The case is to be tried to a jury. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 3-5 days. Settlement discussions have not taken place. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2025. Deposition due by 5/31/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 12/13/2024) (tg) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo: Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2024 at 3:00 pm. See transcript for details. Transcript for this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached Order Form. (rdz) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER denying as moot13 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying as moot13 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying as moot13 Letter Motion to Stay. Application DENIED as moot in light of Defendant's Answer filed at ECF No. 16. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 11/25/2024) (vfr) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: The Court shall hold a case management conference on December 13, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. by telephone. Counsel should contact chambers using the Court's conference line, +1 646-453-4442 (Conference ID: 260 319 736#). Initial Conference set for 12/13/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 11/22/2024) (sgz) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(Yim, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(Yim, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER: By an Order of Reference dated October 10, this case was referred to Magistate Judge Lehrburger for general pretrial and settlement. On October 16, the case was reassigned to me. As soon as practicable, the parties are directed to contact Chambers at RicardoNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov, copying all counsel, to schedule a settlement conference for a time when they believe it would be productive. The parties are also directed to review the "Procedures for All Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo," available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-henry-j-ricardo. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 11/12/2024) (ks) |
|
14 | 14
![]() LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael DiGiulio dated November 12, 2024 re:13 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024. LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Answer addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024. LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024. . Document filed by Kreshnik Hoti..(Digiulio, Michael) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Answer addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024., LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Michael D. Yim, Esq. dated 11/8/2024. Document filed by Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(Yim, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 10/17 9:36 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo)(Text Only Order) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/16 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/16 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Settlement. Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger no longer referred to the case. Motions referred to Henry J Ricardo. (tro) |
||
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(Yim, Michael) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 10/10/2024) (tg) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ORDER: The above captioned cases are both brought by Plaintiffs Kreshnik Hoti and Desiart Ymergag against Patsy's Italian Restaurant for alleged wage and hour violations and claims of discrimination. Although the wage and hour case (24-CV-6991) includes additional plaintiffs, there appears to be overlap between the two matters. As such, the Court is likely to consolidate these actions for discovery. In advance of doing so, however, the Court is referring the parties in both matters to a settlement conference before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If settlement is unsuccessful, the parties are directed to file a status report within one week of that settlement conference. At that point, the Court will schedule an initial pretrial conference in both cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 10/10/2024) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Yim on behalf of Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(Yim, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc., served on 9/30/2024, answer due 10/21/2024; Sal Scognamillo served on 10/1/2024, answer due 10/22/2024. Service was accepted by Co-worker. Document filed by Kreshnik Hoti..(Digiulio, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/20 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro) |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo..(jgo) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Digiulio on behalf of Kreshnik Hoti, Desiart Ymeraga..(Digiulio, Michael) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 09/17 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated May 28, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 09/17 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 09/17 10:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 09/17 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 09/17 10:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc., and Sal Scognamillo, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kreshnik Hoti, Desiart Ymeraga..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Patsy's Italian Restaurant Inc.,, Sal Scognamillo. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29900753)Document filed by Kreshnik Hoti, Desiart Ymeraga..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel) |