Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ashely M Chan
Case #: 2:24-bk-13275
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025

Debtor
Ron Fish Electrical Services, LLC
2743 E Pacific St
Philadelphia, PA 19134-5532
Represented By
BRAD J. SADEK
Sadek Law Offices, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ROBERT W. SEITZER
1900 Spruce Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 12:03 AM EDT
Monday, September 16, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 09/16 12:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-13275 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25995352. Fee Amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 09/16 12:47 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Ron Fish Electrical Services, LLC. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 03/17/2025. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Matrix List of Creditors Mon 09/16 12:48 PM
Matrix List of Creditors Filed. Number of pages filed: 0, Filed by BRAD J. SADEK on behalf of Ron Fish Electrical Services, LLC. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 09/16 1:41 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by BRAD J. SADEK on behalf of Ron Fish Electrical Services, LLC. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]