Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-02187
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Williams Rush & Associates, LLC
Represented By
Charles James McHale, Jr.
Martin Golden Lyons Watts Morgan
contact info
Dale Thomas Golden
Martin Golden Lyons Watts & Morgan, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Cohen
Represented By
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Gerald D Lane, Jr
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Jibrael S. Hindi
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/18 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 22 Order by Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. (McHale, Charles)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Sat 02/15 3:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by November 3, 2025. Dispositive motions due by December 17, 2025. Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 14, 2026, at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the June 2026 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by December 3, 2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/15/2025. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 order Order Wed 02/12 10:00 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement still fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "the name of each person, attorney, association of persons, firm, law firm, partnership, corporation, limited liability company, subsidiary, conglomerate, affiliate, member, and any other identifiable legal entity that has, or might have, an interest in the outcome of this action, including through any ownership however small of a party's shares or stock, as well as all other identifiable legal entities related to any party in the case." See (Doc. 16 ). Specifically, the defendant still fails to identify the members of Williams Rush & Associates, LLC, who necessarily have an interest in the case. The defendant must file a new statement that complies with this order by identifying the membership of Williams Rush & Associates, LLC, by February 18, 2025. Should the defendant fail to comply, a default will be entered without further notice. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/12/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 4:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. (Golden, Dale)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Tue 02/11 2:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "the name of each person, attorney, association of persons, firm, law firm, partnership, corporation, limited liability company, subsidiary, conglomerate, affiliate, member, and any other identifiable legal entity that has, or might have, an interest in the outcome of this action, including through any ownership however small of a party's shares or stock, as well as all other identifiable legal entities related to any party in the case." See (Doc. 16 ). Specifically, the defendant fails to identify the membership of Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. The defendant must file a new statement using the form attached to the 16 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by February 18, 2025. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/11/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 8:23 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. (Golden, Dale)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 order Order Mon 02/10 10:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: On January 24, 2025, the Court ordered the defendant to file an amended Corporate Disclosure Statement that conforms to the requirements set out in the 16 Civil Case Order by February 7, 2025. The defendant fails to respond. The defendant is therefore ordered to show cause by February 14, 2025, why the Court should not enter a default against it. Alternatively, the defendant may file an amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by February 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/10/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
17 17 order Order Fri 01/24 9:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "ownership however small of a party's shares or stock," not simply those whose ownership constitutes 10% or more. See (Doc. 15 ). The defendant must file a new statement using the form attached to the 16 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by February 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/24/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
16 16 12 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 9:23 AM
CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/24/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 misc Case Management Report Thu 01/23 1:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 minutes Case Management Conference Fri 01/17 11:42 AM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 1/17/2025. (Digital) (AMS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/16 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re:5 Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for Consideration of the Inexpensive Determination, Efficient, and Abbreviated Litigation (IDEAL) Program. A brief case management conference is set for January 17, 2025, at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference.(MEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 01/16 10:05 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2025. (Digital) (AMS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 01/07 3:16 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. (McHale, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/17 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re:5 Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for Consideration of the Inexpensive Determination, Efficient, and Abbreviated Litigation (IDEAL) Program (IDEAL Referral Order). For the reasons set forth in the IDEAL Referral Order, a case management conference is set for January 16, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. The parties should review the IDEAL Referral Order in advance of the hearing and be prepared to discuss any procedures that they believe could streamline discovery, motions practice, and trial. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference. (MEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/13 3:22 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Williams Rush & Associates, LLC.(McHale, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 10/31 2:30 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by James Cohen. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 10/31 2:26 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James Cohen. Related case(s): No (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 10/31 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Faaris Kamal Uddin on behalf of James Cohen. Lead Counsel: Faaris K. Uddin. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Fri 09/27 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (AMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Wed 09/18 10:44 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Williams Rush & Associates, LLC. (AM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 09/18 10:42 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Faaris Kamal Uddin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/17 9:35 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-2187-KKM-CPT. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Williams, Rush & Associates LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22524096) filed by James Cohen.(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons