Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:24-cv-00221
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Ethan Coretz Goemann
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Samuel M. Schwartz-Fenwick
Seyfarth Shaw Llp-Il
contact info
Nathan P. Lusignan
Seyfarth Shaw Llp-Il
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Cannon
Represented By
Daniel Seth Holliday
Mcmahan Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 30, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/30 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 10:34 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to Administratively Close this case based on settlement. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/4/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/04 10:35 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 12/03 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint Notice of Settlement And Request For Stay) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/02 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/17/2025. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/2/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
10 10 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 11/14 4:34 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Lusignan, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
9 9 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/04 2:24 PM
ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan P. Lusignan. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/4/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/01 4:20 PM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/1/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 11/01 3:05 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13833653). Attorney Samuel M. Schwartz-Fenwick added appearing on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 11/01 4:08 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan P. Lusignan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13833722). Attorney Nathan P. Lusignan added appearing on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 11:19 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan P. Lusignan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13833722).by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Goemann, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 11:15 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13833653).by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Goemann, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 10/17 10:11 AM
Return of Service Executed by Stephanie Cannon. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/25/2024, answer due 10/16/2024. (Holliday, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/16 11:00 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goemann, Ethan)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/16 10:58 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Discovery ends on 3/17/2025.(Goemann, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 09/16 2:39 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (dob)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Stephanie Cannon. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC13722334)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet