Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Ray Kent
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:24-cv-00946
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2024 11:06 PM EDT
defendant
Adam Houghton
defendant
Unknown Party #2
defendant
Unknown Party #1
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies)
defendant
Walton L. Smith
defendant
Unknown Simon
defendant
Unknown Shafer
defendant
Unknown Saad
defendant
Michelle Norton
defendant
Heidi Washington
defendant
David Maranka
defendant
Matthew Macauley
defendant
Unknown Luther
defendant
Sara Heydens
defendant
B. Hadden
defendant
Jim Dunigan
defendant
John Davids
defendant
Jeremy Bush
defendant
R. Brokaw
defendant
Unknown Bookie
defendant
Unknown Bonn
defendant
J. Atearn
defendant
B. Addis
plaintiff
Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775
named as Artavius J. McDowell Ionia (MSP) Ionia Correctional Facility 1576 W Bluewater Hwy.
Ionia, MI 48846

GPO Oct 17 2024
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
GPO Oct 17 2024
JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, October 17, 2024
8 8 order Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) Thu 10/17 10:28 AM
JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
7 7 14 pgs order Opinion (Screening) Thu 10/17 10:27 AM
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 10/17 12:49 PM
Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)8 , Opinion (Screening)7 sent via U.S. Mail to Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775 (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case Tue 10/01 11:38 AM
NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings pursuant to Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge5 ; Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (in referral role) no longer assigned to case (ems)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 10/01 11:40 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case6 sent via U.S. Mail to Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775 (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/01 11:21 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heidi Washington filed by Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775 (ems)
Related: [-]
misc Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) Tue 10/01 11:32 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from5 ) by plaintiff Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ems)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/17 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF SEVERED CASE (pjw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 09/17 1:58 PM
Copy of Notice (Other)4 sent via U.S. Mail to Artavius Jamal McDowell (slk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
utility Copies Mailed Mon 09/16 10:52 AM
Copy of Order3 sent via U.S. Mail to Alrelio Evans #367619, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Denzil Bell #770562, Wiley Mayes #793413, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Justin Thomas #671685, Xavier Smith #773449, Samuel Bush #576866, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358, Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Keith Darrius Manders #968218 and Joe W. Straws #280558 with amended complaint form (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
3 3 ORDER severing case into 16 related cases; directing plaintiffs to file amended complaints; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
2 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
Related: [-]
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice2 sent via U.S. Mail to Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Justin Thomas #671685, Alrelio Evans #367619, Denzil Bell #770562, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Samuel Bush #576866, Xavier Smith #773449, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358 (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Justin Thomas #671685, Alrelio Evans #367619, Denzil Bell #770562, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Samuel Bush #576866, Xavier Smith #773449, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number 100005246 for filing fee (pjw)
Related: [-]
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiffs Nicholas Bailey #970872, Denzil Bell #770562, Samuel Bush #576866, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Alrelio Evans #367619, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Xavier Smith #773449, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Justin Thomas #671685, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
Related: [-]