New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:24-cv-01119
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Syracuse University
Plaintiff
Joan L. Bryant
2677 E. Genesee St
Syracuse, NY 13224


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/03 11:12 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): that the this action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant Syracuse University. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 12/03/2024. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 12/3/2024.)(hmr)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Letter Request Tue 12/03 8:45 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal7 , Letter Motion5 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 12/19/2024 is STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2024. (Copy sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/02 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Joan L. Bryant. [Filed via MFT on 12/2/2024.] (hmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/02 4:32 PM
PROOF of Service for Summons Issued served on Syracuse University on 11/27/2024, filed by Joan L. Bryant. [Filed via MFT on 11/27/2024.] (hmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 12/02 4:23 PM
Letter Motion from Joan L. Bryant requesting an adjournment of the December 19, 2024 conference, due to her not being able to comply with the sixty-day service requirement. [Filed via MFT on 11/27/2024.] (hmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 order Order of Recusal Fri 09/27 10:22 AM
TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL and ASSIGNMENT: The Magistrate Judge hereby RECUSES himself from this action. The Clerk is authorized and directed to randomly reassign this case to another Magistrate Judge. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk enter this Order of Recusal for the undersigned; that the Clerk has randomly reassigned this case to U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric to conduct all further proceedings. Judge David N. Hurd remains the District Judge assigned to the case. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 9/27/2024. (Copy served via regular mail) (kmc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 09/27 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2024 is RESCHEDULED for 12/19/2024 at 11:00 AM at 15 Henry Street, 1st Floor Courtroom, Binghamton, NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/12/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Copy sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdc )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 09/17 8:59 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/9/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Copy served via Regular Mail on Pro Se Plaintiff) (ztc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Syracuse University. (Copy served on Pro se Plaintiff via Regular Mail) (ztc)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 09/17 8:17 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 27HOPGR0 (jel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Syracuse University filed by Joan L. Bryant. {Filed via MFT on 9/12/2024}(ztc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to Syracuse University (IFP),
Att: 3 Cover Letter