District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:24-cv-02658
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
ROCKWELL MAINTENANCE LLC
Plaintiff
BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By
Charles William Gilligan
O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/12 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND (Gilligan, Charles)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 11/12 6:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, without prejudice, pursuant to plaintiff's4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 12, 2024. (lcbah2)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 09/20 10:10 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ROCKWELL MAINTENANCE LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
2 2 order Standing Order Thu 09/19 5:28 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 19, 2024. (lcbah2)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/19 10:12 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against ROCKWELL MAINTENANCE LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11163531) filed by BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND.(Gilligan, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons