New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Paul J Evangelista
Case #: 1:24-cv-01125
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Saratoga Hospital
Represented By
Colm P. Ryan
Barclay Damon Llp - Albany Office
contact info
Kyra Ganswith
Barclay Damon Llp - Albany Office
contact info
Brian E. Whiteley
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Baldwin
Represented By
Samuel J. Adams
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Gustavo F. Bruckner
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Ankita Sangwan
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Duguay
Represented By
Samuel J. Adams
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Gustavo F. Bruckner
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Ankita Sangwan
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Morizio
Represented By
Samuel J. Adams
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Gustavo F. Bruckner
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Ankita Sangwan
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Price
Represented By
Samuel J. Adams
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Gustavo F. Bruckner
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Ankita Sangwan
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 10 pgs order Order on Letter Request Thu 04/17 10:34 AM
ORDER granting21 Letter Request to approve Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order [Order issued]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 4/17/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 04/14 11:29 AM
Letter Motion from Gustavo F. Bruckner, Counsel for Plaintiffs (and writing on behalf of all parties) for Elizabeth Baldwin, Joel Duguay, Sara Morizio, Patricia Price requesting that the Court enter a confidentiality stipulation and protective order to govern the confidentiality of discovery materials in this case, submitted to Judge Paul J. Evangelista .(Bruckner, Gustavo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 11:37 AM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2025. Discovery due by 1/30/2026. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/17/2025. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/14/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 12/12/2025. Motions to be filed by 2/27/2026. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/2/2025. Status Report due by 6/30/2025. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 1/21/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 9:55 AM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saratoga Hospital. (Whiteley, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 01/21 9:52 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Deadline for Mediator Selection is reset for 7/2/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Mon 01/20 8:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 2/18/2025. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 9/2/2025. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 1/20/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 01/20 7:04 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/17/2025 by telephone. [10:00am-10:20am] Appearances by Bruckner, Esq., Sangwan, Esq., and Adams, Esq. for Plaintiff; Whiteley, Esq., Ganswith, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Uniform Pre-trial Scheduling Order will be issued. The ADR referral Order will be issued. (tab)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
17 17 notice Notice - Other Fri 01/10 3:27 PM
TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16, Initial Conference in this matter, is set for 1/17/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista. The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel are directed to DIAL IN @ 518-217-2288 and use Conference ID 169 018 82 # to connect to the conference call. (tab)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/10 1:28 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/10/2025. (tll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
15 15 misc Civil Case Management Plan Thu 01/09 12:07 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Joel Duguay, Patricia Price, Elizabeth Baldwin, Sara Morizio. (Bruckner, Gustavo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 1:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Saratoga Hospital.(Whiteley, Brian)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 8:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colm P. Ryan on behalf of Saratoga Hospital (Ryan, Colm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 11/14 2:18 PM
COURT NOTICE of Conference: Based on the extended deadline for Defendant to answer, the Initial Conference is reset for 1/17/2025 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/10/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call in advance of the scheduled date and time. (tab)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Letter Request Thu 11/14 2:11 PM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Letter Requesting a new deadline to answer or respond to the complaint by 12/20/2024 with any opposition to a motion to dismiss by 2/14/2025: Saratoga Hospital answer due 12/20/2024. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/14/2024. (tab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyra Ganswith on behalf of Saratoga Hospital (Ganswith, Kyra)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 11/05 12:50 PM
Letter Motion from Brian E. Whiteley for Saratoga Hospital requesting a new deadline to answer or respond to the complaint by 12/20/2024 with any opposition to a motion to dismiss by 2/14/2025 submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel (consented to by Plaintiffs) . (Whiteley, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian E. Whiteley on behalf of Saratoga Hospital (Whiteley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/26 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint, Summons in a Civil Action, General Order #25, Civil Case Assignment & Filing Order, Civil Case Management Plan (Affirmation of Service) served on Saratoga Hospital (Laura Bruno, PFS Customer Service) on September 24, 2024, filed by Elizabeth Baldwin, Joel Duguay, Sara Morizio, Patricia Price. (Bruckner, Gustavo)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel J. Adams on behalf of Elizabeth Baldwin, Joel Duguay, Sara Morizio, Patricia Price (Adams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 09/26 2:23 PM
***Answer due date updated for Saratoga Hospital. Answer due 10/15/2024. (ham)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/23 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ankita Sangwan on behalf of Elizabeth Baldwin, Joel Duguay, Sara Morizio, Patricia Price (Sangwan, Ankita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Tue 09/17 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to parties Joel Duguay, Patricia Price, Elizabeth Baldwin, and Sara Morizio. Attorneys Samuel J. Adams, email address is sjadams@pomlaw.com, and Ankita Sangwan, email address is asangwan@pomlaw.com. Phone number for both is 212-661-1100. Admission requirement emailed to both Samuel J. Adams, and Ankita Sangwan, on 9/17/2024.Admissions due by 10/1/2024. (ham)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 09/17 1:48 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2024 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/9/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ham)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Saratoga Hospital. (ham)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Saratoga Hospital (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6869926) filed by Joel Duguay, Patricia Price, Elizabeth Baldwin, and Sara Morizio.(ham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet