U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company v. Shelter Island IGA LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Wicks |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06531 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:56 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
Shelter Island IGA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Blazhe Spirkoski
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Keith Horsham
|
|
Defendant
Keith Horsham
|
|
Defendant
Shelter Island IGA LLC
1038 Park Blvd
Massapequa, NY 11762 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blazhe Spirkoski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company
a/s/o 17 Smith Street SI LLC 1190 Devon Park Dr.
Wayne, PA 19087 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 12/03 1:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Civil Case Terminated. The case is dismissed without prejudice, without costs to either party as against the other, in light of the Stipulation of Discontinuance, ECF No.18 . The Initial Conference scheduled for December 12, 2024 at 12:00 PM before the undersigned is hereby cancelled . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/3/2024. (DF) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Shelter Island IGA LLC, Blazhe Spirkoski (Dunn, Timothy) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Shelter Island IGA LLC and Blazhe Spirkoski ANSWER to1 Complaint, of US Underwriters Insurance Company a/s/o 17 Smith Street SI LLC , CROSSCLAIM against Keith Horsham by Blazhe Spirkoski, Shelter Island IGA LLC. (Dunn, Timothy) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be held on December 12, 2024 at 12:00 PM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than December 5, 2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. Parties shall comply with Judge Wicks' Individual Rules regarding Expectations for Remote Appearances (Rule §1E) . THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. Counsel for all parties are directed to review Docket Entry No.6 , concerning the assignment of a Magistrate Judge to oversee this case. If by January 13, 2025 all parties have not signed and filed the consent form consenting to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge, the Clerk of Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to the case. In that event, the assigned Magistrate Judge will remain on the case and preside over all non-dispositive pretrial matters unless the assigned District Judge orders otherwise. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/4/2024. (DF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Saturday, November 02, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Sat 11/02 6:33 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time within which Defendants Shelter Island IGA LLC and Blazhe Spirkoski shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including 11/15/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/2/2024. (Wicks, James) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Sat 11/02 6:37 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as moot in light of prior Order entered this same date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/2/2024. (Wicks, James) |
||
Friday, November 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, ,13 Notice of Appearance,1 Complaint, by Shelter Island IGA LLC, Blazhe Spirkoski. (Dunn, Timothy) |
|
14 | 14
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Shelter Island IGA LLC, Blazhe Spirkoski. (Dunn, Timothy) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Dunn, III on behalf of Shelter Island IGA LLC, Blazhe Spirkoski (aty to be noticed) (Dunn, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company. Blazhe Spirkoski served on 9/28/2024, answer due 10/21/2024. (Sylianteng, William) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company. Shelter Island IGA LLC served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Sylianteng, William) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to Keith Horsham, Shelter Island IGA LLC, and Blazhe Spirkoski. (AMF) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by U.S. Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/18 9:13 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ) |
||
misc
Quality Control Check - Summons
Wed 09/18 9:15 AM
Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The full case caption must appear on each summons and/or a rider. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ) |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by US Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by US Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by US Underwriters Insurance Company (Sylianteng, William) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Keith Horsham, Shelter Island IGA LLC, Blazhe Spirkoski filing fee $ 405, receipt number BNYEDC-18288220 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by US Underwriters Insurance Company. (Sylianteng, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |