New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-06530
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Defendant
Hollis Drugs Inc.
Represented By
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Artur Israilov
Represented By
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 through 5
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
James A McKenney
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Robert A. Stern
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Lee Pinzow
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
James A McKenney
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Robert A. Stern
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Lee Pinzow
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By
James A McKenney
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Robert A. Stern
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Lee Pinzow
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/28 12:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, and Allstate IndemnityCompany (collectively Plaintiffs), and their counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against Defendants John Does 1 through 5 and ABC Corporations 1 through 5 (Defendants).Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/28/2025. (SWJ)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Fri 03/28 12:10 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, as follows: Any and all claims and defenses by and between Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, and Allstate Indemnity Company (collectively Plaintiffs), on the one hand, and Hollis Drugs Inc. and Arthur Israilov (Defendants), on the other, are hereby voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii).Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/28/2025. (SWJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/28 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company as to Defendants John Does 1 through 5 and ABC Corporations 1 through 5 (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/28 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Hollis Drugs Inc. and Arthur Israilov by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 03/17 12:27 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff is directed to file the stipulation of voluntary dismissal by 04/16/2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 3/17/2025. (AS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 03/14 7:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/18 4:44 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff is directed to file the Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal by 03/17/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 2/18/2025. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/14 2:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/15 11:41 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff is directed to File the Stipulation of Dismissal by 02/14/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 1/15/2025. (MED)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/13 5:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 11/18 2:52 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' status letter and is pleased that they have reached a settlement in principle. Plaintiffs are directed to file the Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal by 01/15/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 11/18/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 11/15 11:41 AM
STATUS REPORT by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Austen Obiajuly Ugweches on behalf of Hollis Drugs Inc., Artur Israilov (aty to be noticed) (Ugweches, Austen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/29 9:02 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants are directed to file their answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by 11/18/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 10/29/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/23 2:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Hollis Drugs Inc., Artur Israilov. (KD)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 09/17 2:43 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 09/17 2:43 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A McKenney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (McKenney, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Stern on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/17 2:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
1 1 51 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18288133 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Appendix,
Att: 4 Compendium of Exhibits
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/17 2:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]