Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Mark A Roberts
Case #: 6:24-cv-02049
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 3:41 AM CDT
Defendant
John Deery Motors, Inc
Plaintiff
Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc
Represented By
Brandon L Bigelow
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Lauren G Leipold
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Adam D Zenor
Zenor Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/26 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Mailed to Patent and Trademark Office) (pac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/25 8:08 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the filing of15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (pac)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/24 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 02/24 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 12/03 7:57 AM
ORDER granting in part12 Joint Motion to Stay. The parties have until 2/24/2025 to file a notice of settlement or a proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/3/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Wed 11/27 5:01 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay Due to Facilitate Settlement by Plaintiff Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/30 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon L Bigelow on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Bigelow, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren G Leipold on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Leipold, Lauren)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines Thu 09/26 1:30 PM
Set Deadline: Defendant John Deery Motors, Inc's LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/25/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/25 5:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. John Deery Motors, Inc waiver sent on 9/20/2024, answer due 11/19/2024.. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/19 10:02 AM
Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 12/16/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandon L Bigelow and3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren G Leipold: Upon review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. Attorneys Bigelow and Leipold must register for E-Filing with the Northern District of Iowa through PACER and file their Notice of Appearance by 10/2/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/2024. (eBigelow, eLeipold) (pac)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/18 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Mailed to Patent and Trademark Office) (pac)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/18 9:04 AM
Summons Issued as to John Deery Motors, Inc ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****. (pac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Packet
5 5 notice Notice - MJ Case Assignment Wed 09/18 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/17/2024. (pac)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/18 8:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Statement Tue 09/17 3:25 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Motors Corporation for Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 3:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren G. Leipold ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4246642) by Plaintiff Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Admission and Good Standing
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandon L. Bigelow ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4246636) by Plaintiff Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Admission and Good Standing
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint (Dismissal Ddl) Tue 09/17 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against John Deery Motors, Inc. d/b/a John Deery Mitsubishi ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4246573.), filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Zenor, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 2022.11.11 Notice of Default,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2022.11.15 Response from Deery Counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 2022.12.16 MMNA Response to Deery Counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - 2023.04.24 MMNA to Deery (TM violations),
Att: 6 Exhibit E - 2023.04.30 Arenson to Seyfarth re Deery Mitsubishi,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - 2024.08.22 Renewal reservation of rights - John Deery Mitsubishi