Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:21-cr-00382
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2021
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 3:37 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jay L. Hoffer
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ernest McMullen (1)
Terminated: 06/18/2024
Represented By
Sara Lenore Mieczkowski
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Ryan J. Maguire
Federal Defender Office, Mdfl
contact info
Kathleen M. Sweeney
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Tina Budzisz
Office Of Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 4:41 AM EDT
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Ernest McMullen (1) count(s) 1-2. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Ernest McMullen. (MCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal as to Ernest McMullen (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (MCB)
Related: [-]