Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12156

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-12158
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Silvergate Capital Corporation
4225 Executive Square Suite 600
La Jolla, CA 92037
Represented By
Paul Noble Heath
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Anthony M. Calvano
Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Martin
Ellerman Enzinna Levy PLLC
contact info
Emily Rae Mathews
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Justin M Williams
Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Robert J. Stearn, Jr.
Richards, Layton & Finger, P. A.
contact info
Alexander A. Gerten
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
John D. Buretta
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Benjamin B Arcano
Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
David T Queroli
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Benjamin Gruenstein
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Merchant
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Gabrielle Colson
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
David E. Ross
Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Paul H Zumbro
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Michael N Levy
Ellerman Enzinna Levy PLLC
contact info
Colin Meehan
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Geoffrey S. Goodman
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Roger S. Stronach
Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Lindsay J Timlin
Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Lauren A. Moskowitz
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
George E Zobitz
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 10:27 PM EDT
Attorney
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
Represented By
David T Queroli
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Emily Rae Mathews
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Attorney
Ellerman Enzinna Levy PLLC
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor
Stilwell Activist Investments, L.P
Represented By
Evan T. Miller
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
NYDIG Servicing LLC
Represented By
Jennifer L Cree
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Douglas Curran
contact info
Jonathan Kortmansky
contact info
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Kimberly A. Brown
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
Joewy Gonzalez, Nicole Keane, Matson Magleby, and Golam Sakline on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
DANIEL C. GIRARD
contact info
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Compass Point Research & Trading, LLC, Craig-Hallum Capital Group LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc
Represented By
Michele D. Johnson
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Douglas K. Yatter
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Adam J. Goldberg
Latham & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Austin Park
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Alexandra Marie Zablocki
Latham & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Ebba Gebisa
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Jason C. Hegt
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Creditor
Kathleen Fraher
Represented By
John C Gentile
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Benjamin Wiley Butterfield
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Capuzzi
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Andrew Kissner
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Theresa A. Foudy
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Darren Smolarski, Esq
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
23611 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 207
Beachwood, OH 44122
Represented By
Alan C. Hochheiser
Maurice Wutscher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, Delaware Trustee, Institutional Trustee, and Guarantee Trustee
Represented By
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Examiner
Stephanie Wickouski
34 Greene St. #3S
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Brett H. Miller
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
John P Patouhas
Wilkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Donald Burke
Willkie Farr & Emery LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Financial Advisor
AlixPartners, LLC
Interested Party
UMC Benefit Board, Inc.
Represented By
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Antonio Martino
Represented By
Adam Lurie
Linklaters LLP
contact info
Patrick Coby Ashby
Linklaters LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Myers Raulston
Limklaters LLP
contact info
Edward L. Schnitzer
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Mangan
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Hunker
Linklaters LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Robert C. Campbell, Derek Eisele, and Dennis S. Frank
Represented By
Joseph M Mulvihill
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Alexander J. Nicas
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Aaron Thompson, Esq.
contact info
Jonathan A. Shapiro
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Stacy Dasaro
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wespath Institutional Investments LLC
Represented By
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By
Tina N. Moss
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Jason S. Levin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago
Represented By
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Mona Brunette, Bernie Chavez, Steven Dietz, Osman Gabiere, Gosandy Pang, Tyler Pearson, Michelle Sabins, Natalie Schima and Levi Stanley
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Sarah Campbell
Clifford Chance LLP
contact info
Douglas E. Deutsch
Clifford Chance Us LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Members Pension Benefit Trust of Ontario
Represented By
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Christopher Lane
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Patricia L. Liverpool
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Michael L. Spafford
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Friedrick
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Emily Kuznick
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Interested Party
International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 793
Represented By
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Indiana Public Retirement System
Represented By
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Jan Messerschmidt
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Uslaner
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann Ll
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Exploration Capital Fund, LP
Represented By
Melissa M. Hartlipp
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Bruce Bennett
Jones Day
contact info
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Christopher J. DiPompeo
Jones Day
contact info
Joshua M. Mester
Jones Day
contact info
Interested Party
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
Interested Party
Boston Retirement System
Represented By
Brendan Schneiderman
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
S. Douglas Bunch
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Carol V. Gilden
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Steven J. Toll
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
contact info
Hannah Ross
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Chelsea R. Frankel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
John Rizio-Hamilton
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Alan J. Lane
Represented By
Destiny A. Kosloske
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Geoffrey S. Goodman
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Michael J. Small
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Preferred Stockholders
Represented By
Gregory J. Flasser
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
L. Katherine Good
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Jonghyun (John) Lee
Milbank LLP
contact info
Alex Miller
Milbank LLP
contact info
Dennis F Dunne
Milbank LLP
contact info
Lauren C. Doyle
Milbank LLP
contact info
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
John P. Estep
Milbank LLP
contact info
Andrew M. Leblanc
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Alexander Lees
Milbank LLP
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
680 680 claims Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/30 2:27 PM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Exploration Capital Fund, LP. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 676
679 679 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Wed 04/30 1:27 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation // Seventh Monthly Application of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Co- Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
678 678 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Wed 04/30 12:56 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation // Seventh Monthly Fee Application of AlixPartners, LLC, Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. Objections due by 5/20/2025. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
677 677 misc Statement of Professionals' Compensation Wed 04/30 10:04 AM
Statement of Professionals' Compensation (Notice of Filing of Debtors' Second Quarterly Statement Regarding Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for Services Provided During the Period of January 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025) Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
676 676 16 pgs motion Authorize - Motion Tue 04/29 10:01 PM
Joint Motion to Authorize / Joint Motion of Exploration Capital Fund LP and Stilwell Activist Investments, L.P., to Expand the Scope of the Examiner's Investigation Filed by Exploration Capital Fund, LP. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/6/2025. (Pernick, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
675 675 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/29 8:43 PM
Notice of Service regarding Stilwell Activist Investments, L.P.'s First Request for Production of Documents in Connection with Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Global Settlement Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Filed by Stilwell Activist Investments, L.P. (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
674 674 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 04/29 4:34 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Fifth Monthly Application of Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Co- Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Related [+] Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 635
673 673 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 04/29 4:13 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Fourth Monthly Fee Application of Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as 327(e) Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the period from February 1, 2025 to February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 636
672 672 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 04/29 3:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Related [+] Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Ross, David)
Related: [-] 612
671 671 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Tue 04/29 3:01 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Sixth Monthly Application of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Co- Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the period from February 1, 2025 to February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 624
Monday, April 28, 2025
670 670 crditcrd none Mon 04/28 9:07 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)([LINK 24-12158 KBO] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12148087, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
669 669 10 pgs motion Relief from Stay - Motion (FEE) Mon 04/28 9:06 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) (Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code for Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay with Respect to the Securities Litigation Settlement) . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Silvergate Capital Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/6/2025. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, April 25, 2025
668 668 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 04/25 5:14 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Seventh Monthly Fee Application of Ellerman Enzinna Levy PLLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as 327(E) Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-possession for the Period From March 1, 2025, Through March 31, 2025 (Docket No. 662), Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Global Settlement, Including Debtors Entry Into and Performance Under Indemnification Settlement and Securities Litigation Settlement, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019, and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 664) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 662 ,664
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
667 667 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 04/23 5:29 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Order Granting Examiner's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Examiner to File Under Seal the Report of Stephanie Wickouski, as Examiner Related [+] Filed by Stephanie Wickouski. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 666
666 666 order Motion to File Under Seal Wed 04/23 2:15 PM
Order Granting Examiner's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Examiner to File Under Seal the Report of Stephanie Wickouski, as Examiner Related [+] Order Signed on 4/23/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 632 ,633 ,634 ,663
665 665 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Wed 04/23 11:40 AM
Application for Compensation // First Combined Monthly Application of Stephanie Wickouski and Pivot Group for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Examiner and Advisor to the Examiner for the period from January 31, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Stephanie Wickouski. Objections due by 5/13/2025. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Certificate of Service