Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12156

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:24-bk-12165
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tupperware Products AG
14901 S Orange Blossom Trl
Orlando, FL 32837-6600
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 order Dismissing Case - Claims Agent Mon 11/25 8:44 AM
Order (I) Approving the Dismissal of the Chapter 11 Case of the Swiss Debtor and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 11/24/2024. (LCN)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 11/25 8:45 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 11/06 11:44 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities,. Filed by Tupperware Products AG. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 11/05 10:54 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Tupperware Products AG. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Mon 09/23 12:29 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Tupperware Brands Corporation, Case No. 24-12156 (BLS); Dart Industries Inc., Case No. 24-12160 (BLS); Deerfield Land Corporation, Case No. 24-12161 (BLS); Premiere Products, Inc., Case No. 24-12162 (BLS); Tupperware Home Parties LLC, Case No. 24-12163 (BLS); Tupperware International Holdings Corporation, Case No. 24-12164 (BLS); Tupperware Products AG, Case No. 24-12165 (BLS); Tupperware Products, Inc., Case No. 24-12166 (BLS); Tupperware U.S., Inc., Case No. 24-12167 Case 24-12156 BLS Doc 69 Filed 09/20/24 Page 4 of 55 (BLS); and Tupperware Brands Latin America Holdings, L.L.C., Case No. 24-12168 (BLS). The docket in Case No. 24-12156 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 9/23/2024 (ASA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 09/19 10:55 AM
Motion to convert was filed in main case # 24-12156 Receipt Number 10095207, Fee Amount $15.00 (COH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 09/18 3:58 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12165 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11796805, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Wed 09/18 2:32 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Tupperware Brands Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
court Case Assigned Wed 09/18 8:21 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 09/17 11:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Tupperware Products AG. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick