7
|
|
7
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 11/22 12:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Jose Ovidio Hernandez. (ar)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Mailing Receipt
Thu 10/31 9:11 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Jose Ovidio Hernandez 13 Weber Drive Apt. GB Port Chester, NY 10573. (ak)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Mailing Receipt
Thu 10/31 9:43 AM
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Judgment
Wed 10/30 1:55 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in the October 25, 2024, order, Plaintiff's federal claims are dismissed, 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii), and the Court declines, under 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3), to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of his state law claims. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2024) (nd) Modified on 10/30/2024 (nd)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of right to appeal
|
5
|
|
5
7
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 10/30 9:32 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL... Plaintiff's federal claims are dismissed, 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii), and the Court declines, under 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3), to exercise supplemental jurisdiction of his state law claims. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/25/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 10/09 11:09 AM
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Tue 10/08 12:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/8/2024) (nb)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 09/18 10:10 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Jose Ovidio Hernandez 13 Weber Drive Apt. GB Port Chester, NY 10573. (ak)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs
Tue 09/17 10:58 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (nb)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party
Tue 09/17 10:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(nb)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 09/17 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/17 10:55 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jose Ovidio Hernandez. (nb)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/17 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Marci Dustin, Farva Jafri, Jenna Lazzaro, Sami Nasser, Richard Sklarin. Document filed by Jose Ovidio Hernandez. (nb)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 09/17 10:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (nb)
Related: [-]
|