New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:24-cv-06549
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
DS Medical Diagnostics P.C.
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Shifteh, M.D.
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Shaare Tzion Imaging LLC
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Rashbi Ventures LLC
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Rashbi Diagnostics Imaging Inc.
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Elchin Rafailov
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
David Modnyy
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Isaac Mizrahi
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Hanan Miller, MD
Represented By
Oleg Rybak
The Rybakfirm, PLLC
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Michael Kroopnick
The Rybak Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alec Miller
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Artur Kofman
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Defendants "1"-"10"
Defendant
I&A Imaging LLC
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Healthcare Medical Services PLLC
Represented By
Oleg Rybak
The Rybakfirm, PLLC
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Michael Kroopnick
The Rybak Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Akiva Imaging Inc.
Represented By
Stefan Belinfanti
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Austen Obiajuly Ugweches
Austen O. Ugweches, Esq.
contact info
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
John Paul Mulvaney
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
John Paul Mulvaney
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
John Paul Mulvaney
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
John Paul Mulvaney
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Sunday, May 18, 2025
81 81 misc Letter Sun 05/18 4:48 PM
Letter Response to Court's Order to produce responses to all outstanding document requests by Akiva Imaging Inc., DS Medical Diagnostics P.C., I&A Imaging LLC, Artur Kofman, Alec Miller, Isaac Mizrahi, David Modnyy, Elchin Rafailov, Rashbi Diagnostics Imaging Inc., Rashbi Ventures LLC, Shaare Tzion Imaging LLC, Daniel Shifteh, MD (Tsirelman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
80 80 misc Status Report Fri 05/16 6:42 PM
STATUS REPORT pursuant to Court's May 13, 2025 Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Mulvaney, John)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 05/16 11:05 PM
ORDER regarding80 - Defendants shall produce responses to all outstanding document requests by 3 p.m. on May 19, 2025. Plaintiffs shall file a letter by 12 p.m. on May 20, 2025 indicating whether the responses have been provided. Should Defendants fail to produce the outstanding responses, sanctions may issue against Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/16/2025. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
79 79 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 05/13 4:56 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Akiva Imaging Inc., DS Medical Diagnostics P.C., I&A Imaging LLC, Artur Kofman, Alec Miller, Isaac Mizrahi, David Modnyy, Elchin Rafailov, Rashbi Diagnostics Imaging Inc., Rashbi Ventures LLC, Shaare Tzion Imaging LLC, Daniel Shifteh, MD (Tsirelman, Gary)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 05/13 6:34 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of79 . Sanctions will not be issued at this time. The parties shall provide a joint status report as to the status of discovery by May 16, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/13/2025. (GWM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
78 78 misc Status Report Mon 05/12 7:22 PM
STATUS REPORT - pursuant to Court's direction in April 10, 2025 Minute Entry by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Mulvaney, John)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause Mon 05/12 10:34 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On April 10, 2025, the Court ordered the Akiva Defendants to produce the outstanding written discovery by May 9, 2025. Plaintiffs report that "[t]o date, Akiva Defendants have not served any responses to Plaintiffs' document demands and have not provided any responses to the interrogatories served on Defendant Akiva Imaging Inc."78 . Plaintiffs also state that "while the other Akiva Defendants recently provided Plaintiffs with written interrogatoryresponses, the interrogatory responses served by Defendants Daniel Shifteh, M.D. ('Dr. Shifteh')and DS Medical Diagnostics, P.C. ('DS Medical') are unverified and, therefore, wholly deficient." Plaintiffs add that the Akiva Defendants have also not produced "a single MRI film." The Akiva Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE by 5 p.m. on May 13, 2025 as to why sanctions should not be issued due to the Akiva Defendants' failure to comply with the Court's April 10, 2025 order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/12/2025. (JAM)
Related: [-]