Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Pitlyk
Case #: 4:24-cv-01267
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Angie's Transportation, LLC
Represented By
Andrew R. Magdy
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Defendant
STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC
Represented By
Andrew R. Magdy
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Defendant
Angelina Twardawa
9817 Grandview Estates Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63127
Represented By
Andrew R. Magdy
Summers Compton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BMO Bank N.A.
Represented By
Morgan Elizabeth Fox
Husch Blackwell Llp - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
27 27 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 04/11 10:19 AM
Docket Text ORDER: The current trial setting is VACATED, to be reset at a later date. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/11/2025. (AFO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 03/21 9:43 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Angelina Twardawa Proposed Order by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Statement of Material Facts Fri 03/21 9:37 AM
STATEMENT of Material Facts re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Angelina Twardawa filed by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A..(Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stacy Winistorfer,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Aaron B. Chapin
24 24 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/21 9:33 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Angelina Twardawa filed by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 03/21 9:32 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Angelina Twardawa by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
22 22 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 01/14 8:48 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendants Angie's Transportation, LLC, STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC, Angelina Twardaw . Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental party, including individuals, or intervenors must file a Disclosure Statement in any case based on Diversity Jurisdiction immediately upon entering its appearance in the case, completing Sections 1 and 2 of the form. In Section 2 of the form, individual parties must list the party's name and state of citizenship (Not Residence or Domicile); non-individuals must include the state of incorporation/formation and state of primary business practice ( See FRCP 7.1 ); LLCs, LLPs must include all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations and his/her/its state of citizenship (see above). These entities must be entered into CM/ECF where prompted. Parties must use the Court adopted form.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CBL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 order CJRA Order Mon 12/16 1:17 PM
CJRA ORDER (NMG) - Pursuant to full consent to jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge not being received, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk) (KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Wed 12/04 10:50 AM
SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Angie's Transportation, LLC, STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC, Angelina Twardawa to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/11/2024. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Order Wed 11/27 10:50 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2: Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 12/2/2024. Discovery Completion due by 2/21/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2025. Bench Trial set for 5/21/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 11/27/24. (KJS)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Rule 16 Conference Wed 11/27 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby:Rule 16 Conference held on 11/27/2024. Conference held via Zoom. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (proceedings started: 10:29 am) (proceedings ended: 10:34 am) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Morgan Fox)(Appearance for Defendant: Andrew Magdy) (KJS)
Related: [-]
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Wed 11/27 10:51 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Angie's Transportation, LLC, STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC, Angelina Twardawa to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/4/2024. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Wed 11/20 8:41 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. Proposed Joint Scheduling Plan Track 2 . (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
17 17 misc Declaration Fri 11/15 12:03 PM
DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A. re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and an Order of Replevin (Declaration of Micki Koepke . (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
16 16 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/15 12:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and an Order of Replevin filed by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 11/15 11:59 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and an Order of Replevin by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A..(Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Replevin
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 order Rule 16 Order Thu 11/07 10:15 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE This case is assigned to Track: 2 motion is IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: [SEE FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/20/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/27/2024 10:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/20/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 11/7/2024. (JMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/06 3:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Angie's Transportation, LLC, STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC, Angelina Twardawa.(Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Wed 11/06 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM re1 Complaint, Verification of BMO Bank, N.A. to Complaint by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
11 11 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 10/16 2:32 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew R. Magdy for Defendants Angie's Transportation, LLC, STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC, Angelina Twardawa. (Magdy, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Fri 10/11 10:49 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/18/2024. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 9:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by BMO Bank N.A.. Angelina Twardawa served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 9:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by BMO Bank N.A.. Angie's Transportation, LLC served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 9:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by BMO Bank N.A.. STL Equipment Leasing Co., LLC served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 8:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Personal Service Upon Angelina Twardawa by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 8:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Substituted Service Upon Angie's Transportation by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit Thu 10/03 8:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Substituted Service Upon STL Equipment Leasing Company by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A.. (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Wed 09/18 6:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 09/18 11:26 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Bank N.A., BMO Financial Corp... (Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Wed 09/18 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A. Process Server: Captured Investigative Agency(Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons to Angie's Transportation,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to STL Equipment Leasing Co.,
Att: 3 Summons Summons to Angelina Twardawa
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/18 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10832610, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by BMO Bank N.A..(Fox, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 09/18 12:08 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Morgan Elizabeth Fox. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]