Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-70259

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 7:24-ap-07004
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Land Resources and Royalties LLC
Represented By
Land Resources and Royalties LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
167 Consol Tipple Road
Deane, KY 41812
Represented By
Matthew Casto
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
contact info
T. Kent Barber
Embry Merritt Womack Nance PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/28 12:03 PM
Adversary Proceeding 24-7004 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
44 44 order Consolidate Wed 01/22 3:34 PM
Agreed Order GRANTING Regarding Dismissal and Consolidation Related [+]. Counts I, II and III of the Complaint are dismissed with prejudice, and Counts IV and V of the Complaint are consolidated with and into AP No. 24-7007 (gsc)
Related: [-] 41
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
43 43 audio Audio File Tue 01/21 12:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/21/2025 10:45:45 AM ]. File Size [ 2882 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:01 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
42 42 court Hearing Held Tue 01/21 11:59 AM
Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 34 Order Continuing Status Hearing
Sunday, January 19, 2025
41 41 motion Consolidate Mon 01/20 8:57 PM
Joint Motion for Dismissal of Counts I, II and III of Complaint and to Consolidate Counts IV and V of Complaint with and into AP No. 24-7007 filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC and Land Resources and Royalties LLC (gsc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Sun 01/19 2:40 PM
Joint Motion for Dismissal and for Consolidation, filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC, Land Resources and Royalties LLC (Barber, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
39 39 court Defective Order Mon 12/23 5:01 PM
Notice of Deficiency This Order is defective. Hearing information is missing, incomplete or incorrect. An Order continuing status hearing has already been entered by the Court [ECF No. 34]. No further action will be taken on this entry - Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 38 Proposed Order Submitted filed by T. Kent Barber on behalf of Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
38 38 misc Proposed Order Submitted Mon 12/23 11:56 AM
Proposed Order submitted by T. Kent Barber on behalf of Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC, Land Resources and Royalties LLC Related [+]. (Barber, T.)
Related: [-] 28 Setting or Continuing Hearing,30 Order (Generic)
Thursday, December 19, 2024
37 37 crtrptr Transcript Thu 12/19 11:55 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/19/24. Remote Electronic Access to the transcript is restricted until 03/19/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the Court Reporter. Contact: J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
36 36 appeal Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript Tue 12/17 2:09 PM
Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript received on 12/17/2024. The reporter expects to have the transcript completed by 12/23/2024 Related [+]. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-] 35
35 35 court Notice of Transmittal and Certification of Audio Files Tue 12/17 1:10 PM
Notice of Transmittal and Certification of Audio Files to J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Court Transcriber. Related [+]. (Sutphin, Sheila)
Related: [-] 33 Request for Transcript
34 34 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Tue 12/17 11:39 AM
Order Continuing Status Hearing. Status hearing to be held on 1/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
33 33 misc Request for Transcript Mon 12/16 2:52 PM
Request for 3-Day Transcript of Hearing/Examination held on 11/19/2024. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Agreed Order Mon 12/16 1:59 PM
Agreed Order Regarding Status Hearing and Supplemental Order Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 28 Order Continuing Status Hearing and30 Supplemental Order
31 31 misc Proposed Order Submitted Mon 12/16 1:11 PM
Proposed Order submitted by T. Kent Barber on behalf of Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Barber, T.)
Related: [-] 28 Setting or Continuing Hearing,30 Order (Generic)
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
30 30 order Generic Tue 12/10 3:31 PM
Supplemental Order Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 28 Order Continuing Status Hearing
Monday, December 09, 2024
29 29 order Summary Judgment Mon 12/09 3:20 PM
Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
28 28 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Wed 11/20 4:12 PM
Order Continuing Status Hearing. Status hearing to be held on 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
27 27 court Hearing Held Tue 11/19 2:38 PM
Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held. (awd)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Hearing Held Tue 11/19 2:37 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (awd)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
25 25 audio Audio File Tue 11/19 1:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/19/2024 10:31:16 AM ]. File Size [ 8868 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:36:57 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
24 24 answer Response/Reply Mon 11/11 4:03 PM
Reply Filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Bunn, Joseph)
Related: [-] 23 Response/Reply filed by Defendant Land Resources and Royalties LLC
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 answer Response/Reply Tue 10/29 9:50 PM
Response Filed by Land Resources and Royalties LLC Related [+]. (Back, Adam)
Related: [-] 14 Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment,18 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Deane Lease
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - January 2017 Clarification
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Collected Default Letters
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Lopez Deposition
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Cross-Motion for Temp Injunction Memo in Support
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - July 8, 2023 Email and Letter of Intent
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - July 9, 2023 Email
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - July 14, 2023 Email
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - July 15, 2023 Email
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - August 27, 2023 Email
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - October 17, 2023 Email
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - October 17, 2023 Jensen Email
Monday, October 28, 2024
22 22 notice Notice Mon 10/28 3:30 PM
Notice of Consent to Entry of Final Order and Judgment Filed by Land Resources and Royalties LLC. (Back, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
21 21 epo File Statement re Consent Mon 10/21 7:51 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer, [ECF No. 20 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, It is ORDERED that, within 7 days from the entry of this Order, Adam M. Back, Esq. shall file a notice regarding consent in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 10/28/2024. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 utility Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 10/18 5:16 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by Land Resources and Royalties LLC Related [+]. (Back, Adam)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
19 19 court Entry re Original Pleading Wed 10/16 3:08 PM
An amended/corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [ECF No.18 ] having been filed, parties are hereby notified that based upon the submission of the amended/corrected pleading, the original Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [ECF No.10 ] will be deemed withdrawn unless an objection is filed within 3 working days from the date of this entry. (gsc)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Wed 10/16 12:15 PM
Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC (Casto, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Special Corporate Warranty Deed between Reserve Holdings, LLC & Deane Mining, LLC
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Special Corporate Warranty Deed between Deane Mining, LLC & Land Resources
Att: 4 Exhibit C. Real Estate Purchase and Sale Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit D. Integrity Electronic Transfer Schedule
Att: 6 Exhibit E. Affidavit of Paul Lopez
Att: 7 Exhibit F. October 17, 2023 letter from J.Bunn to T.Sauve
Att: 8 Exhibit G. October 24, 2023 email from J.Bunn to M.Jensen
Att: 9 Exhibit H. Letter of Intent
Att: 10 Exhibit I. September 25, 2023 letter from Deane Mining, LLC to Bluegrass Resources, LLC
Att: 11 Exhibit J. October 17, 2023 email from M.Jensen to J.Bunn
Att: 12 Exhibit K. Complaint filed in Letcher County, Kentucky
Att: 13 Exhibit L. Motion for Ex Parte Restraining Order, Letcher County, Kentucky Action
Att: 14 Exhibit M. Temporary Ex Parte Restraining Order, entered in Letcher County, Kentucky Action
Att: 15 Exhibit N. Order Holding Defendants in Civil Contempt, entered in Letcher County, Kentucky Action
Att: 16 Exhibit O. Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Answer, Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaims, Letcher County, Kentucky Action
Att: 17 Proposed Order
17 17 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/16 10:41 AM
Court's Certificate of Mailing. Document mailed on October 16, 2024, to Land Resources and Royalties LLC c/o Any Officer or Director at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 AND c/o Thomas Suave, Registered Agent at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 16 Order Continuing Status Hearing
16 16 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Wed 10/16 10:39 AM
Order Continuing Status Hearing. Status hearing to be held on 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/15 4:09 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing. Document mailed on October 15, 2024, to Land Resources and Royalties LLC c/o Any Officer or Director at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 AND c/o Thomas Suave, Registered Agent at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 14 Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment
14 14 order Scheduling Summary Judgment Hearing Tue 10/15 3:57 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+]. Summary Judgment hearing scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 10:00 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
13 13 audio Audio File Tue 10/15 2:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/15/2024 10:24:37 AM ]. File Size [ 7044 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:29:21 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Hearing Held Tue 10/15 1:48 PM
Judge's Minutes of Status Conference Held Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Status Conference
11 11 epo Deficiency re No Order Tendered Tue 10/15 9:27 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the record and finding that no proposed order having been tendered with Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [ECF No. 10 ] as required by KYEB LBR 9013-1(d), It is ORDERED that, within 3 working days from the entry of this Order, a proposed order shall be tendered. Failure to tender an order may result in the denial of the requested relief [ECF No. 10 ]. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Document Due: 10/18/2024 (gsc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Mon 10/14 12:47 PM
Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC (Casto, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Att: 10 Exhibit I
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Att: 12 Exhibit K
Att: 13 Exhibit L
Att: 14 Exhibit M
Att: 15 Exhibit N
Att: 16 Exhibit O
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/02 3:53 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing. Document mailed on October 2, 2024, to Land Resources and Royalties LLC c/o Any Officer or Director at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 AND c/o Thomas Suave, Registered Agent at 8500 East 11th Street, Unit 264, Fishers, IN 46038 Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Status Conference
8 8 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Wed 10/02 3:47 PM
Order Setting Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 10/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service, filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Barber, T.)
Related: [-] 5 Order for Trial
6 6 court Summons Service Executed Mon 09/23 2:22 PM
Summons Service Executed.. (Barber, T.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Trial Mon 09/23 8:58 AM
Order for Trial. Trial set for 1/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Pikeville District Courtroom. (gsc) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Wed 09/18 2:10 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (gsc)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/18 11:08 AM
Amended Complaint by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC against Land Resources and Royalties LLC Related [+] (Barber, T.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Deed dated December 17, 2015
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Deed dated October 24, 2016
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Real Estate Purchase and Sale Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Electronic Payment
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Letter of Intent
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F Bluegrass Sublease
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G Letter dated October 17, 2023
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H October 24, 2024 Email
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I November 11, 2024 Email
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J Complaint
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K Motion for TRO
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L Entered TRO Order
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit M Entered Order Holding Defendants in Contempt
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
2 2 epo Deficiency re Signature Tue 09/17 4:50 PM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9011(a) and/or Section VI of the [LINK:Administrative Procedures Manual] , specifically: Signer on PDF does not match Certified User ECF login. It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless the deficiency is corrected within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 9/24/2024. (gsc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 4:37 PM
Adversary case 24-07004 Complaint, filed by Integrity Carbon Solutions LLC against Land Resources and Royalties LLC Fee Amount 350. (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Barber, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deed Dated December 17, 2015
Att: 2 Exhibit Deed Dated October 24, 2016
Att: 3 Exhibit Real Estate Purchase and Sale Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit Electronic Payment Schedule
Att: 5 Exhibit Letter of Intent
Att: 6 Exhibit Bluegrass Sublease
Att: 7 Exhibit Letter dated October 17, 2023
Att: 8 Exhibit October 24, 2024 Email
Att: 9 Exhibit November 11, 2024 Email
Att: 10 Exhibit Complaint
Att: 11 Exhibit Motion for TRO
Att: 12 Exhibit Entered TRO Order
Att: 13 Exhibit Entered Order Holding Defendants in Contempt