Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:24-cv-12384
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Case in other court:Plymouth County Superior Court, 2483CV00408
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
East Bridgewater Post Office
475 L'Enfant Plaza SW Room 2P530
Washington, DC 20260
Represented By
Nicole M. O'Connor
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Jean Rubicine
68 Walnut St
East Bridgewater, MA 02333


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
13 13 misc Mail Returned Tue 01/28 10:30 AM
Mail sent to Jean Rubinice re11 Judgment, 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Returned as Undeliverable. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 misc Copy Mailed Mon 12/23 2:03 PM
Copy re11 Judgment, 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, mailed to Jean Rubicine on 12/23/2024. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Judgment Mon 12/23 1:58 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/23 1:55 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss, Doc. No. 5, on October 29, 2024. Counsel for Defendant sent a copy of the Motion to Plaintiff via first-class mail on that same date. Id. at 10. Plaintiff failed to respond within fourteen days?by November 12?pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(b)(2). On November 20, the Court ordered Plaintiff to respond to the Motion by December 20, or else face dismissal for failure to comply with the Court?s Order and for failure to prosecute this action. Doc. No. 6 at 2. Cognizant of Plaintiff?s allegations regarding delivery of her mail, the Court sent this Order to Plaintiff at the address on file by: (1) USPS, first-class mail, postage prepaid; (2) USPS, certified mail, return-receipt requested; and (3) FedEx. Doc. No. 7. The latter two forms of mail were returned as undeliverable on December 2, with a note on the returned FedEx envelope suggesting Plaintiff no longer lives at that address. Doc. Nos. 8, 9. Pro se parties such as Plaintiff are required, under Local Rule 83.5.5(h), to inform the clerk and all parties of any change in address within fourteen days of the change. Plaintiff has evidently failed to comply with this rule. Because Plaintiff failed to comply with the Court?s Order of November 20 and because Plaintiff has failed to prosecute this case, the Motion to Dismiss, Doc. No. 5, is ALLOWED as unopposed. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close this case. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/02 2:56 PM
USPS first class mail sent to Jean Rubicine re 7 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/02 11:33 AM
FedEx Mail sent to Jean Rubicine re 7 Copy Mailed, Returned as Undeliverable. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
7 7 misc Copy Mailed Thu 11/21 8:44 AM
Copy re6 Order mailed to Jean Rubicine by USPS first class mail, USPS, certified mail return-receipt requested. Certified mail number: 7022 0410 0001 7382 8405, and FedEx. FedEx tracking number 8169 1685 7521 on 11/21/2024. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/21 7:50 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to the pending motion to dismiss, Doc. No. 4 , no later than December 20, 2024. If she fails to do so, the Court will dismiss the case due to her failure to comply with this Order as well as her failure to prosecute this action. (Cooke, Melonie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 10/29 11:05 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by East Bridgewater Post Office.(O'Connor, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly Herbst
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 10/29 11:04 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by East Bridgewater Post Office.(O'Connor, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 09/18 4:28 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 09/18 4:14 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/18 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by East Bridgewater Post Office ( Fee Status: US Government)(O'Connor, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket,
Att: 3 Category Form,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet