Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:24-cv-12386
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By
Michael E. Jusczyk
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
First National MBank of Nebraska
Defendant
Western States Bank
Plaintiff
Donald L. Brown
95 University Ave. Apt. 2311
Westwood, MA 02090


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 appeal USCA Mandate Sat 04/26 3:11 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald L. Brown. Appeal17 Terminated (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
22 22 appeal USCA Judgment Fri 04/04 6:25 AM
USCA Judgment as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald L. Brown (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 01/13 11:45 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1049 for17 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Donald L. Brown. (MAP)
Related: [-]
20 20 appeal Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA Mon 01/13 8:22 AM
Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re17 Notice of Appeal (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice - Other Tue 12/31 1:11 PM
NOTICE by Donald L. Brown re17 Notice of Appeal,(Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Checklist,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
18 18 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/27 11:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald L. Brown.(Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 12/23 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order Dismissing Case by Donald L. Brown NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at[LINK:http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov] MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 1/13/2025.(Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Finanical Affidavit
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/18 11:08 AM
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/18 11:02 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2024 re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning filed by First National Bank of Omaha. After hearing arguments of the plaintiff, the Court dismisses the case, not on the merits but on the issue of res judicata. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at rhr3tubas@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Plaintiff appears pro se and Attorney Jusczyk for the defendants) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Wed 11/06 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning : Motion Hearing reset for 12/17/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 11/06 3:39 PM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Assented to Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Tue 11/05 8:33 AM
Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on FNBO's Motion to Dismiss to Date after December 9, 2024 by First National Bank of Omaha.(Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Mon 10/21 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 10/17 3:34 PM
Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning filed by Donald L. Brown.(Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 misc State Court Record - answer filed in state court Sat 09/28 10:24 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice requesting courtesy copy Thu 09/26 6:57 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting PAPER courtesy copy for7 Memorandum in Support of Motion,6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office Attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 09/25 4:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning filed by First National Bank of Omaha. (Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/25 4:44 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Issuance of a Cok Warning by First National Bank of Omaha.(Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint from Dedham District Court Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2024.06.21 Order Directing Dismissal of First Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 2024.06.21 Order of Dismissal of First Action,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Complaint Filed in First Action
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
5 5 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 09/18 4:42 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/18 4:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First National Bank of Omaha identifying Corporate Parent First National of Nebraska for First National Bank of Omaha.. (Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice - Other Wed 09/18 4:32 PM
NOTICE by First National Bank of Omaha Statement of Related Cases (Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 09/18 4:28 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/18 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First National Bank of Omaha ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10607028 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jusczyk, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 15 Category Form