New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-09272
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court, Essex County, ESX-DC-020362-24
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORPS I-X
Defendant
RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By
AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY
Sessions, Israel& Shartle, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KARLA BECERRIL
Represented By
LOUIS JOSEPH JOHNSON, JR.
The Law Office Of Louis J. Johnson Jr., L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 02/12 10:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by KARLA BECERRIL. (JOHNSON, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 02/06 3:18 PM
ORDER Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/7/2025. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/6/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Text Order Thu 02/06 11:38 AM
TEXT ORDER: Action will be dismissed with prejudice as represented by counsel a stipulation of dismissal will be docketed by February 12, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/6/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/06 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 order Order Thu 01/23 3:30 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has violated consecutive Orders, (ECF Nos. 5, 6), by (1) failing to participate in preparing a pretrial scheduling order; (2) failing to attend the 11/20/24 initial conference; and (3) failing to contact the Court and "show cause as to why he is not participating in this suit." The Court previously warned that "failure to prosecute and failure to appear on conferences will result in dismissal." (ECF No. 6). In the interest of justice, the Court will afford Plaintiff another opportunity to prosecute this case. The Court will conduct a telephone conference on 2/6/25 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/23/2025. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 order Text Order Wed 11/20 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff failed to appear on court ordered conference and failed to file a scheduling order. Office telephone lines are disconnected. Plaintiff counsel will immediately contact this court with connection information and will show cause as to why he is not participating in this suit. He is warned that failure to prosecute and failure to appear on conferences will result in dismissal.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/20/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 11/20 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 order Text Order Tue 10/08 9:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 11/20/24 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/8/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 10/08 9:48 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 3:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC.(EASLEY, AARON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 09/26 10:02 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/9/2024. (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 09/24 5:37 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY for RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC added. (EASLEY, AARON)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 09/20 8:02 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/19 10:52 AM
Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 09/18 4:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC identifying NGI Acquisitions LLC as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/18 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC from Superior Court, Essex County, case number ESX-DC-020362-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15674409), filed by RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LLC.(EASLEY, AARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B -Notice of Filing Notice of Removal