Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00167
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Amit Agarwal
Represented By
Nathan A. Huff
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan A. Huff
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazon Data Services India Private Limited
Plaintiff
L. Rochelle Bankhead
65 Crescent Street
Newnan, GA 30265
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Amazon India Private Limited
Terminated: 03/12/2025
Represented By
Nathan A. Huff
K&l Gates LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/05 9:54 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Amend filed by L. Rochelle Bankhead. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 2:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Amend filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 motion Amend Thu 04/10 3:03 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by L. Rochelle Bankhead.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit D,
Att: 4 Exhibit E,
Att: 5 Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 03/31 2:57 PM
Submission of15 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 03/24 2:18 PM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 03/12 2:29 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Substitute Party. Amazon Data Services India Private Limited added. Amazon India Private Limited terminated. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/12/2025. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/12 2:31 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to L. Rochelle Bankhead re22 Order on Motion to Substitute Party. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/11 8:57 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by L. Rochelle Bankhead.(dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/25 11:41 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to file response to the Defendants' motion to dismiss. Time is extended until 3/10/2025. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/25/2025. (dmb)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 11:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re17 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re:15 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by L. Rochelle Bankhead (dmb)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 11:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re16 MOTION to Substitute Party Amazon India Private Limited filed by L. Rochelle Bankhead (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/25 11:43 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to L. Rochelle Bankhead re20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/24 4:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to15 MOTION to Dismiss by L. Rochelle Bankhead. (dmb)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Substitute Party Mon 02/24 4:41 PM
MOTION to Correct Docket by L. Rochelle Bankhead. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 02/10 10:41 AM
Clerk's Notation re14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 02/07 5:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Amit Agarwal, Amazon India Private Limited, Amazon.com, Inc..(Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 5:43 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amit Agarwal, Amazon India Private Limited, Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate A100 Row, Inc. for Amazon India Private Limited. (Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/07 4:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re12 Notice of Appearance by Amit Agarwal, Amazon India Private Limited, Amazon.com, Inc..(Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Huff on behalf of Amit Agarwal, Amazon India Private Limited, Amazon.com, Inc. (Huff, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/15 11:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amit Agarwal. Amit Agarwal waiver mailed on 1/13/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (dmb)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/15 11:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amazon India Private Limited. Amazon India Private Limited waiver mailed on 1/13/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (dmb)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/15 11:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Inc.. Amazon.com, Inc. waiver mailed on 1/13/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 12/10 2:00 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Amit Argawal on 12/10/2024. If waiver not returned by 1/14/2025, prepare personal service package. (dmb)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 12/10 1:59 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Amazon India Private Limited on 12/10/2024. If waiver not returned by 1/14/2025, prepare personal service package. (dmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 12/10 1:45 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Amazon.com, Inc. on 12/10/2024. If waiver not returned by 1/14/2025, prepare personal service package. (dmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Remark Tue 12/10 1:22 PM
USM 285 forms and summonses received. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk ~Util - Forms Sent Wed 11/20 3:11 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to send Bankhead a USM 285 from and summons for Defendants. Bankhead is directed to complete and return to the Clerk of Court the forms within 20 days. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within Thirty-five(35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/20/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/20 3:15 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to L. Rochelle Bankhead re4 Order and Forms Sent. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT filed by L. Rochelle Bankhead.(dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order ruling on IFP ~Util -Service of Process Shall Not Issue Thu 09/19 12:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Service of Process shall not issue at present time. The Clerk is directed to refrain from forwarding the petition to the United States Marshals Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise. The Clerk is also directed to submit this file to the assigned District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/19/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 09/19 12:36 PM
Submission of3 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 12:37 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to L. Rochelle Bankhead re2 Order. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/18 4:30 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by L. Rochelle Bankhead.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/18 4:31 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jkb)
Related: [-]