California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01893
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 19, 2024 12:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Jeremy Rudy Medina (1)
Represented By
Carson Porter Baucher
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Ruby Leslie Palacios (2)
Represented By
Ralph Cordova, Jr.
contact info
Charles Halligan Adair
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Francisco Flores-Lobato
Represented By
Anahita Hasheminejad
Law Offices Of Anahita Hasheminejad
contact info
Material Witness
Pablo Ortega-Leal
Represented By
Anahita Hasheminejad
Law Offices Of Anahita Hasheminejad
contact info
Material Witness
Juan Ramon Villegas-Perez
Represented By
Anahita Hasheminejad
Law Offices Of Anahita Hasheminejad
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Calen A. Bennett
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 12 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jeromy Rudy Medina (1), Count(s) 1-3, 2s-3s, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining counts without prejudice - granted; Count(s) 1s, Defendant sentenced to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for Time Served; $10 penalty assessment remitted; Fine waived; Appeal rights waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (rxc)
GPO Nov 12 2024
JUDGMENT as to Ruby Leslie Palacios (2), Count(s) 1-3, 3s, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining counts without prejudice - granted; Count(s) 1s-2s, Defendant sentenced to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for Time Served; $10 penalty assessment remitted; Fine waived; Appeal rights waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (rxc)

Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 3:11 AM PDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
Arrest of Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 8/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr..(cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Attorney Federal Defenders is PROVISIONALLY appointed for Ruby Leslie Palacios added. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Anahita Hasheminejad for Juan Ramon Villegas-Perez,Anahita Hasheminejad for Pablo Ortega-Leal,Anahita Hasheminejad for Jose Francisco Flores-Lobato appointed. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Ruby Leslie Palacios. (ecf) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
7 7 PS (Unsecured) Bond Filed as to Ruby Leslie Palacios in amount of $ 10,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/26/24. (Document applicable to USA, Jeremy Rudy Medina.) (ecf) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ruby Leslie Palacios.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/26/24. (ecf) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jeremy Rudy Medina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/26/24. (ecf) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
11 11 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios held on 8/26/2024. Proffer, Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jeremy Rudy Medina,Charles Halligan Adair,Ralph Cordova, Jr for Ruby Leslie Palacios. Federal defenders relieved for Ruby Leslie Palacios. Bond set as to Jeremy Rudy Medina (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA and Ruby Leslie Palacios (2) $10,000 P/S secured by defendants signature. Bond submitted for Ruby Leslie Palacios, abstract issued. MW counsel confirmed. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/5/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 9/19/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(CD# 8/26/2024 LR2024 2:14-2:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (Defendant Attorney Bacilio Varela). (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Jeremy Rudy Medina: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/26/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Ruby Leslie Palacios: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/26/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
4 4 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios: Arraignment of MW set for 8/27/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
5 5 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios: Arraignment of MW set for 8/27/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carson Porter Baucher appearing for Jeremy Rudy Medina (Baucher, Carson)Attorney Carson Porter Baucher added to party Jeremy Rudy Medina(pty:dft)(axc1). [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
15 15 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Ruby Leslie Palacios. Report prepared by: C. Noriega, Pretrial Officer. (Noriega, C.) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment of Material Witness Pablo Ortega-Leal, Jose Francisco Flores-Lobato held on 8/27/2024. Material Witness bail set at $5,000 P/S w/10 percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 8/27/2024 LR2024 2:12-2:16). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Jose Francisco Flores-Lobato. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/27/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Pablo Ortega-Leal. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/27/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios: Arraignment of MW set for 8/28/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Juan Ramon Villegas-Perez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/28/2024. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment of Material Witness Juan Ramon Villegas-Perez held on 8/28/2024. Material Witness bail set at $5,000 P/S w/10 percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 8/28/2024 LR2024 1:55-1:59). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Calen A. Bennett appearing for USA. (Bennett, Calen)Attorney Calen A. Bennett added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
23 23 P/S Bond Filed as to Jeremy Rudy Medina in amount of $ 20,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 8/29/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Jeremy Rudy Medina.) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
24 24 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Jeremy Rudy Medina re23 Bond. (cxl) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
25 25 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Jeremy Rudy Medina. Report prepared by: C.Cera. (Document applicable to USA, Jeremy Rudy Medina.) (Cera, C.) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
26 26 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Calen A. Bennett appearing for USA. (Bennett, Calen) *QC Mailer sent; duplicate filing (axi). [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
27 27 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Ruby Leslie Palacios. Preliminary Hearing is set for 9/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (aum) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
28 28 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Jeremy Rudy Medina. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/19/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (ccc) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
29 29 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendants Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios. On Court's own motion Arraignment set for 9/16/2024 at 1:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/16/2024 at 1:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (no document attached) (aum) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
30 30 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendants Jeremy Rudy Medina, Ruby Leslie Palacios. At the request of MW counsel, Motion Hearing - Material Witness is set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (no document attached) (aum) [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Bennett, Calen) (axi). [2:24-mj-08730-LR]
Related: [-]
32 32 INFORMATION as to Jeremy Rudy Medina (1) count(s) 1-3, Ruby Leslie Palacios (2) count(s) 1-3. (vyc)
Related: [-]
33 33 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Jose Francisco Flores-Lobato, Pablo Ortega-Leal, Juan Ramon Villegas-Perez as to defendant Ruby Leslie Palacios and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 09/16/2024. (mef)
Related: [-]
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment on Information as to Jeremy Rudy Medina (1) Count 1-3 and Ruby Leslie Palacios (2) Count 1-3 held on 9/16/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 10/28/2024 at 11:30 AM in El Centro before District Judge Andrew G. Schopler. (CD# 9/16/2024 LR 24 1:06-1:12). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez S/A). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson S/A (1), Ralph Cordova (2)). (vyc)
Related: [-]
35 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Material Witness Hearing in case as to Ruby Leslie Palacios held on 9/16/2024. MW stip filed (2). Abstracts for MW's not yet issued. MW stip not yet filed for (1). (CD# 9/16/2024 LR 24 1:06-1:12). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez S/A). (Defendant Attorney Ralph Cordova). (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]