California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00471
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 19, 2024 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Kirill Afanasyev (1)
Represented By
Hanni M. Fakhoury
Moeel Lah Fakhoury LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jose Badillo (2)
Represented By
Allen Sawyer
contact info
Defendant
Jason Naraja (3)
Represented By
Ellen Valentik Leonida
Sideman & Bancroft LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jaime Respicio (4)
Represented By
Kathryn Elizabeth Ross
Kathryn Ross, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Galen A. Phillips
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kyle F. Waldinger
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 1:28 AM PDT
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Kirill Afanasyev (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6-9, Jose Badillo (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 5, 6-9, Jason Naraja (3) count(s) 5, 6-9, Jaime Respicio (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (exl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/28/2024 (lsk, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet
4 4 MOTION to Seal Order. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 4 Motion to Seal as to Kirill Afanasyev (1), Jose Badillo (2), Jason Naraja (3), Jaime Respicio (4).(exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]