California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:24-cv-06514
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 1:46 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Rokid, Inc.
Represented By
Ziyong Li
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Counter-defendant
Mielikuva Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Bradford John Black
Bradford Black P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Rokid, Inc.
Represented By
Ziyong Li
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Plaintiff
Mielikuva Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Bradford John Black
Bradford Black P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/11 8:01 PM
ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Motions terminated: 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/2025. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/11 8:00 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC.(Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 02/13 11:49 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Rokid, Inc.. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/09 6:39 PM
ORDER: Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions due by 12/30/2024. Invalidity Contentions due by 2/13/2025. Parties concurrently exchange list of claim terms by 2/27/2025. Parties concurrently exchange proposed constructions andextrinsic evidence due by 3/20/2025. Damages Contentions due by 4/4/2025. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement and Expert Reports due by 4/14/2025. Responsive Damages Contentions due by 5/4/2025. Completion of Claim Construction Discovery due by 5/14/2025. Plaintiff shall file its Opening Claim Construction Brief with supporting evidence by 5/29/2025. Defendant shall file its Responsive Claim Construction Brief with supporting evidence due by 6/12/2025. Plaintiff shall file its Reply Claim Construction Brief with supporting evidence due by 6/19/2025. Damages Contentions Meeting by 7/3/2025. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/7/2025, at 02:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/7/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2025. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/7/2026. Opening Reports due by 1/14/2026. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/13/2026. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/18/2026. Dispositive motion deadline and Daubert motion deadline due by 3/30/2026. Serve Pretrial Disclosures (jury instructions, exhibits lists, witness lists, discovery and deposition designations) due by 6/1/2026. Serve objections to pretrial disclosures/rebuttal disclosures by 6/22/2026. Serve objections to rebuttal disclosures and file Motions in limine due by 7/6/2026. File Joint Pretrial Order and Pretrial Submissions (jury instructions, exhibits lists, witness lists, discovery and deposition designations); file oppositions to motions in limine due by 7/20/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2026 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2026 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/9/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Order Mon 12/09 11:26 AM
Proposed Order re18 Joint Case Management Statement by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC.(Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, November 23, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Case Management Statement Sat 11/23 10:49 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC. (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 11/20 11:36 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 16, 2024
16 16 respoth Answer to CounterClaim Sat 11/16 11:45 AM
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC. (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 11/15 2:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rokid, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rokid Corporation Ltd. for Rokid, Inc.. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 11/15 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Mielikuva Solutions, LLC by Rokid, Inc.. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 09/26 10:43 AM
AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 12/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2024, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at ygrcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 13, 2024, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 09/25 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 12/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2024, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at ygrcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 13, 2024, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC. Service waived by Rokid, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/18 10:12 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/18/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/18 8:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/18 6:25 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC.. (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued as to Rokid, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proposed Summons. (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patent No. 8,619,005 (cc: form mailed to register). (Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Rokid, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19852039.). Filed by Mielikuva Solutions, LLC.(Black, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet