New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-09279
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MORRIS COUNTY, MRS C 000086 24
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 4:33 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY
Represented By
THEODORE JAMES MCEVOY
Brach Eichler, LLC
contact info
DAVID L. HECHT
Hecht Partners LLP
contact info
ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Brach Eichler
contact info
DORIS CHEUNG
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
GERARD P. NORTON
Fox Rothschild
contact info
MICHAEL WILLIAM SABO
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
DAVID GALPERN
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN R. LAGARENNE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN J. MADARA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
PAUL W. KALISH
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY
Represented By
THEODORE JAMES MCEVOY
Brach Eichler, LLC
contact info
EDWARD DANIEL ALTABET
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
DAVID L. HECHT
Hecht Partners LLP
contact info
ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Brach Eichler
contact info
DORIS CHEUNG
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
GERARD P. NORTON
Fox Rothschild
contact info
MICHAEL WILLIAM SABO
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
DAVID GALPERN
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN R. LAGARENNE
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JONATHAN J. MADARA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
PAUL W. KALISH
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
47 47 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 9:57 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/10/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 3/27/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/28/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN J. MADARA on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (MADARA, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
45 45 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/10 4:27 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC..(NORTON, GERARD)
Related: [-]
44 44 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/10 4:18 PM
ORDER Granting43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DELPHINE W. KNIGHT BROWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/10/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/10 8:34 AM
Set Deadlines as to43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 03/03 11:55 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/10/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
43 43 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 6:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY.(HECHT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of David L. Hecht,
Att: 2 Certification of Delphine Knight Brown,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - List of Admissions,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 01/24 9:07 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document42 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/10/2025. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
42 42 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 01/23 2:35 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff, Counterclaim Defendant, Spacemaker Systems, Inc... (KALISH, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
qc QC - Updating Account Wed 01/15 9:22 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE submitted by DORIS CHEUNG on 1/14/2025 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/14 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DORIS CHEUNG on behalf of FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY (CHEUNG, DORIS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD DANIEL ALTABET on behalf of FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY (ALTABET, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
39 39 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/06 7:16 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and , COUNTERCLAIM against SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY.(HECHT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 01/02 8:27 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The38 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC., on 12/31/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/17/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
38 38 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 12/31 3:44 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Spacemaker Systems Inc... (KALISH, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
37 37 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 12/30 11:30 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2025 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/30/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
36 36 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 12/13 5:40 PM
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and , Counter COUNTERCLAIM against SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY.(HECHT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/05 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. HECHT on behalf of FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY (HECHT, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
34 34 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 11/19 2:56 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/19/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
33 33 order Text Order Fri 11/08 8:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Frazier Industrial Company's letter requesting that this matter be restyled as "SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC., Plaintiff, v. FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, Defendant," and requesting that its deadline to respond to Spacemaker's claims be extended to December 13, 2024. (ECF No.32 .) Frazier's requests are hereby granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to update the docket caption accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 11/08/2024. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
32 32 misc Letter Fri 11/01 4:07 PM
Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
31 31 misc Transcript Mon 10/28 12:53 PM
Transcript of BENCH OPINION IN CHAMBERS held on 10/23/2024, before Judge Georgette Castner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly Wilson (609-815-2751). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/18/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
30 30 misc Letter: Remand Wed 10/23 4:11 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Morris County Courthouse Washington & Court Streets Morristown, NJ 07963-0910 State No: MRS C 000086 24. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jdg)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/23 3:58 PM
ORDER that this matter is remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County. The Court retains jurisdiction over Defendant's counterclaims. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 10/23/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
28 28 respoth Brief Tue 10/15 9:38 PM
BRIEF in Response to the Court's Order for Supplemental Briefing Regarding Supplemental Jurisdiction (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
27 27 respoth Brief Tue 10/15 4:05 PM
BRIEF to Further Address Supplemental Jurisdiction(SURIANO, ROSARIA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 9:26 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 11/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
26 26 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 10/11 10:51 AM
Exhibit to25 Motion to Seal, by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY.(LYM, ROBYN) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit C,
Att: 3 Exhibit D
25 25 motion Seal Fri 10/11 10:43 AM
MOTION to Seal by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY.(LYM, ROBYN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Index to Motion to Seal,
Att: 4 Proposed Findings of Fact,
Att: 5 Certification of Service
Thursday, October 10, 2024
24 24 misc Transcript Thu 10/10 10:18 AM
Transcript of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2024, before Judge Georgette Castner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly Wilson (609-815-2751). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/31/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2025. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
23 23 order Text Order Tue 10/08 4:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court following the telephonic conference held with the parties on October 8, 2024. As discussed, and for the reasons set forth on the record by the Court, the parties may submit by no later than October 15, 2024 , supplemental briefing regarding whether Plaintiff's state law claims share a common nucleus of operative fact with Defendant's counterclaims for purposes of exercising supplemental jurisdiction. Any supplemental submission shall not exceed ten (10) double-spaced pages. Plaintiff's time to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant's counterclaims is stayed pending the Court's determination on whether to remand Plaintiff's claims. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 10/8/2024. (jmh)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 10/08 11:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Georgette Castner: Telephone Conference as to the Text Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 12) held on 10/8/2024. Order to issue. (Court Reporter, Kimberly Wilson (609-815-2751) (jmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
21 21 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/01 4:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: A Telephone Conference as to the Text Order Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 12 ) is hereby set for October 8, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Georgette Castner. Dial-in information will be sent via email. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 10/1/2024. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
20 20 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 09/30 3:44 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL W. KALISH on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (KALISH, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/26 9:42 AM
LETTER ORDER Granting17 Plaintiff's request for an extension to submit response brief by 9/30/2024. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 9/25/2024. (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Wed 09/25 12:21 PM
Letter re 12 Text Order,. (LYM, ROBYN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 respoth Brief Tue 09/24 8:16 PM
BRIEF In Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal (ECF No. 12) (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) Mon 09/23 3:19 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC.. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal . (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 09/20 2:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. identifying Spacemaker Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Text Order Fri 09/20 1:40 PM
TEXT ORDER: It has been brought to the Court's attention that the Notice of Removal (Docket Entry No.1 ) may contain confidential business information. The Clerk of the Court is directed to temporarily seal Docket Entry No.1 . In addition, the Court directs the parties to confer and file a joint motion to seal pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3 by 10/11/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/20/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Text Order Fri 09/20 12:29 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff Frazier Industrial Company's letter dated September 19, 2024. (ECF No.8 .) Defendant Spacemaker Systems, Inc. is ordered to show cause by no later than September 24, 2024, as to why this matter should not be remanded. Plaintiff shall be permitted to file a response to Defendant's submission by no later than September 27, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 9/20/2024. (jmh)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE JAMES MCEVOY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MCEVOY, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Fri 09/20 9:40 AM
Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Fri 09/20 9:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The8 "LETTER" submitted by THEODORE MCEVOY on 9/19/2024 was filed incorrectly. Only Local Counsel appearing in the case is permitted to electronically file documents. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT USING THE APPROPRIATE COUNSEL'S ACCOUNT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBYN KATERINA LYM on behalf of FRAZIER INDUSTRIAL COMPANY (LYM, ROBYN)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Thu 09/19 2:20 PM
Letter from Rose A. Suriano Counsel for Plaintiff Frazier Industrial Company Regarding Request to Remand Matter Back to Superior Court. (MCEVOY, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R. LAGARENNE on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (LAGARENNE, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD P. NORTON on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (NORTON, GERARD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID GALPERN on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (GALPERN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WILLIAM SABO on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (SABO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CORINNE MCCANN TRAINOR on behalf of SPACEMAKER SYSTEMS, INC. (TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 09/19 9:54 AM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/19 12:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPACEMAKER INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County, case number MRS-C-000086-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15675072), filed by SPACEMAKER INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS, INC..(TRAINOR, CORINNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/19 8:38 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 09/19 8:41 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: GERARD P. NORTON, MICHAEL G. SABO AND DAVID GALPERN have been removed from the docket. If they would like to be considered counsel of record they will need to file a Notice of Appearance . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/19 9:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mlh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 09/19 9:58 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mlh)
Related: [-]