New York Northern District Court
Judge:Lawrence E Kahn
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:24-cv-01136
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Case in other court:Supreme Court of the State of NY County of Ulster, EF2024-2397
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Chief of Police Clayton Keefe
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake, Loeb Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Town Supervisor Bill McKenna
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake, Loeb Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Town of Woodstock
Represented By
Adam Rodd
Drake, Loeb Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Schleuderer
Represented By
John A. DeGasperis
Basch & Keegan, LLP
contact info
John DeGasperis
New York Injury Law, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/10 10:01 AM
ORDER re16 Stipulation of Discontinuance without Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 2/10/2025. (dpk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/30 8:32 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Anthony Schleuderer. (DeGasperis, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
15 15 order Order on Letter Request Wed 01/15 1:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's request that the Court stay the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss, Dkt. No.8 , while Plaintiff prepares a stipulation of discontinuance. Dkt. No.12 ("Request"). The Request is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance or a status report no later than 1/31/2025. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 1/15/2025. (dpk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 order Order on Letter Request Tue 01/07 7:35 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Request to change attorney. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/7/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 01/07 9:11 AM
Letter Motion from John A. DeGasperis, Esq. for Anthony Schleuderer requesting Consent to Change Attorney .(DeGasperis, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Change Attorney
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 12/30 1:49 PM
Letter Motion from John A. DeGasperis, Esq. for Anthony Schleuderer requesting adjournment of motion submitted to Judge Kahn . (DeGasperis, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 order Order on Letter Request Wed 11/27 1:29 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Letter Request re8 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) . Response to Motion due by 12/31/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/8/2025. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 11/27/2024. (dpk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 11/25 12:40 PM
Letter Motion from John A. DeGasperis, Esq. for Anthony Schleuderer requesting additional time submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (DeGasperis, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 order Order on Letter Request Wed 10/16 10:50 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Letter Request. The initial conference set for October 18th at 10:00 AM is ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after disposition of the8 Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/16/2024. (egr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 3:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Chief of Police Clayton Keefe, Town Supervisor Bill McKenna, Town of Woodstock. Motion returnable before Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 11/5/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/12/2024 (Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff's EEOC Complaint,
Att: 5 Affidavit Certificate of Service
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 10/15 5:03 PM
TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Chief of Police Clayton Keefe, Town Supervisor Bill McKenna, Town of Woodstock. Motion returnable before Judge Lawrence E. Kahn: Response to Motion due by 11/30/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/13/2024. Deadlines reset pursuant to Judge Stewart's Text Order dated September 24, 2024. (dpk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 10/11 3:02 PM
Letter Motion from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. for Chief of Police Clayton Keefe, Town Supervisor Bill McKenna, Town of Woodstock requesting that the October 18, 2024 conference be adjourned, pending determination of the pending motion to dismiss submitted to Judge Magistrate Daniel J. Stewart . (Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Wed 10/09 4:19 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Docket Entry previously at 6 titled Text Order has been deleted in its entirety as it was erroneously filed in this case. (egr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 order Order on Letter Request Tue 09/24 12:11 PM
TEXT ORDER granting4 Letter requesting approval of briefing schedule: The Town Defendants' motion shall be filed by October 15, 2024; the plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by November 30, 2024; and the Town Defendants' reply shall be filed by December 13, 2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/24/2024. (egr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 09/20 12:31 PM
Letter Motion from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. for Chief of Police Clayton Keefe, Town Supervisor Bill McKenna, Town of Woodstock requesting approval of briefing schedule submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Rodd, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
***Answer due date updated for Chief of Police Clayton Keefe answer due 9/25/2024; Town Supervisor Bill McKenna answer due 9/25/2024; Town of Woodstock answer due 9/25/2024. (mmg).
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 09/19 9:26 AM
***Answer due date updated for Chief of Police Clayton Keefe answer due 9/25/2024; Town Supervisor Bill McKenna answer due 9/25/2024; Town of Woodstock answer due 9/25/2024. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 09/19 9:15 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2024 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/11/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Complaint Thu 09/19 9:13 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff in Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Ulster. (mmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Ulster, case number EF2024-2397 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6872245) filed by Town of Woodstock, Town Supervisor Bill McKenna, Chief of Police Clayton Keefe. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet labeled "Exhibit B",
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service of Notice of Removal on John A. DeGasperis,
Att: 4 Receipt of Payment to Northern District of New York.