New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-09305
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC
Represented By
KRISTOFOR T. HENNING
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
PHILLIP STEPHEN PAVLICK
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC.
Represented By
KRISTOFOR T. HENNING
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
PHILLIP STEPHEN PAVLICK
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Defendant
PETER A. UZZOLINO
Represented By
GABRIELLE KOHLHAGEN
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
MELISSA ILYSE FALK
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT D. SALMON
Represented By
XIAOSONG LI
Rainone Coughlin Minchello LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 01/10 2:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC. (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 01/10 1:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC.. (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/08 5:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC. re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, Alternatively, to Strike its Class Action and Immaterial, Impertinent and Scandalous Allegations (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/08 4:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by PETER A. UZZOLINO re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (ISRAEL, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/18 2:19 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT D. SALMON re12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/18 2:13 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT D. SALMON re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, Alternatively, to Strike its Class Action and Immaterial, Impertinent and Scandalous Allegations (LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 12:28 PM
LETTER ORDER granting two-week extension of time for plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 12/4/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Wed 12/04 2:45 PM
Letter re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, Alternatively, to Strike its Class Action and Immaterial, Impertinent and Scandalous Allegations ,12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/20 11:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: The briefing schedule for the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [ECF 11 & 12] is set as follows. The Plaintiff shall respond to the motions on or before December 4, 2024. And the Defendants shall file any reply on or before December 18, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 11/20/2024. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 11/19 1:58 PM
STIPULATION and Consent Order of Briefing Schedule by SCOTT D. SALMON. (LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/19 10:37 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ,11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, Alternatively, to Strike its Class Action and Immaterial, Impertinent and Scandalous Allegations . Motion set for 12/16/2024 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 11/15 5:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PETER A. UZZOLINO.(ISRAEL, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ronald L. Israel,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 11/15 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, Alternatively, to Strike its Class Action and Immaterial, Impertinent and Scandalous Allegations by ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC. Responses due by 12/16/2024.(HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief - Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Certification in support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Certification,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP STEPHEN PAVLICK on behalf of ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC (PAVLICK, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTOFOR T. HENNING on behalf of ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Fri 10/11 4:53 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER extending time to respond to complaint through 11/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/10/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GABRIELLE KOHLHAGEN on behalf of PETER A. UZZOLINO (KOHLHAGEN, GABRIELLE)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA ILYSE FALK on behalf of PETER A. UZZOLINO (FALK, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL on behalf of PETER A. UZZOLINO (ISRAEL, RONALD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Order Wed 10/09 10:42 AM
Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond To Complaint by ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC. (HENNING, KRISTOFOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
misc QC - Generic Message Wed 09/25 2:54 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the3 Complaint submitted by Xiaosong Li on 9/24/2024 was submitted pursuant to the Clerk's Quality Control Message entered on 9/24/2024 regarding improper electronic signature, and the submission is not an Amended Complaint. This message is for informational purposes only, and no further action is required. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/24 11:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT to change signature to filing user against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SCOTT D. SALMON.(LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, PETER A. UZZOLINO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 09/24 10:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jd, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Tue 09/24 10:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 Complaint submitted by XIAOSONG LI on 9/19/2024 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE ENTER AN APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF OR RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against A ABSOLUTE ESCROW SETTLEMENT CO., INC., ACRES LAND TITLE AGENCY, INC, PETER A UZZOLINO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15677248) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SCOTT D SALMON.(LI, XIAOSONG)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/19 4:55 PM
Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
Related: [-]