Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Case #: 3:24-cv-01439
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 4:37 AM AST
Defendant
ItalBank International, Inc.
Bolivia 33 Building Apt 1-A 33 Bolivia Street
San Juan, PR 00917
Represented By
Javier Coronado
Diaz Reus Targ LLP
contact info
Roberto L. Prats-Palerm
Mcconnell Valdes
contact info
Lourdes Adrienne Robles-Torres
contact info
Victoria M. Rivera-Llorens
Mcconnell Valdes LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
International Global Bank N.V.
Represented By
Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez
Monserrate Simonet & Gierbolini LLC
contact info
Ethan Bryce Rodriguez
Diaz, Reus & Targ
contact info
Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez
Monserrate Simonet & Gierbolini, Llc.
contact info
Javier Coronado
Diaz Reus Targ LLP
contact info
Gabor Gazso von Klingspor
Diaz, Reus & Targ, LLP
contact info
Michael Diaz, Jr
Diaz Reus & Targ LLP
contact info
Dora L. Monserrate
Monserrate Simonet & Gierbolini
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
61 61 order Judgment Wed 01/29 4:05 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/29/2025. (mcv)
Related: [-]
60 60 order Order on Motion In Compliance Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 01/29 4:01 PM
ORDER finding as moot2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot22 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot23 Motion to Stay; finding as moot51 Motion In Compliance and finding as moot55 Motion In Compliance in light of the Stipulation of Dismissal at Docket No.59 . Judgment to be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/29/2025. (mcv)
Related: [-]
59 59 misc Stipulation Wed 01/29 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by International Global Bank N.V., ItalBank International, Inc.. (Coronado, Javier)
Related: [-]