California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:24-cv-02016
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Case in other court:San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2424748
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Robert A Shields
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Evan Critchlow
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Ronald Akasaka
Represented By
Ronald Garrett Akasaka
Smart Adr
contact info
Plaintiff
Arielle J Halliburton
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Matthew Kenneth Treybig
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruben C Torres
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Matthew Kenneth Treybig
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Gregory Sogoyan
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 misc Receipt Fri 04/04 9:23 AM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from San Bernardino Superior Court, Case No. CIVSB2424748, acknowledged on 1/8/2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 12/13 6:16 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court, No. CIVSB2424748 (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Remand Case to State Court Fri 12/13 6:14 PM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION [DKT. 12] by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha : The court finds Defendant has failed todemonstrate the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, as required to establishdiversity jurisdiction. The court, therefore, REMANDS the action to the SanBernardino County Superior Court, Case No. CIVSB2424748. All dates anddeadlines in this court are VACATED. The clerk of the court shall close the action administratively. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 11/21 8:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Ronald Akasaka has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
17 17 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 11/20 11:31 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Ron Akasaka may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 4/23/2025 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiffs Ruben C Torres, Arielle J Halliburton(Treybig, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
16 16 misc Response Tue 11/12 2:26 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Companyto Order to Show Cause,12 (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
15 15 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 10/29 11:38 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. Final Pretrial Conference, Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 2/6/2026 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2026 at 8:15 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 10/29 1:39 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 01/02/2026. (tf)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 10/29 1:37 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the November 8, 2024, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/29 1:10 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the amount in controversy does not exceed the jurisdictional threshold. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 10/25 4:37 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Ruben C Torres, Arielle J Halliburton..(Treybig, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Scheduling of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 09/24 12:52 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 09/24 12:49 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 09/23 12:32 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 09/23 12:32 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Mon 09/23 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:24-cv-02016 FLA (SHKx). (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 09/19 5:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, re Jury Demand3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 served on 9/19/2024. (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/19 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Jury Demand Thu 09/19 5:13 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 09/19 5:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/19 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2424748 Receipt No: ACACDC-38246746 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Evan Critchlow added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Critchlow, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Evan J. Critchlow,
Att: 2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B Ford 10K Filing,
Att: 4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - All Pleadings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 09/23 2:33 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10 inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Ruben C Torres, Arielle J Halliburton. Filed in State Court on 8/5/2024 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 09/23 2:37 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]