Google Inc. et al v. GeoTag Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-00175 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2011 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2014 7:48 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
GeoTag Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Google Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GeoTag Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CIVIX-DDI LLC
|
|
Interested Party
DeLorme Publishing Company Inc.
|
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Taleo Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
MapQuest Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Google Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Microsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
1. | Keker Scores for Google in GeoTag Patent Fight (litigationdaily.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/23/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
528 | 528
notice
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
Thu 06/23 5:29 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael J. Bettinger, Irene I. Yang, Christy V. La Pierre, Michael J. Abernathy, and Brian J. Arnold as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm of K&L Gates LLP. (Palapura, Bindu) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
527 | 527
notice
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
Wed 06/22 2:29 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Rebekah L. Punak and Abhishek Bajoria as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at the firm of Keker & Van Nest LLP. (Palapura, Bindu) |
|
526 | 526
notice
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
Wed 06/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Maulik G. Shah as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at the firm of Arnold & Porter LLP. (Palapura, Bindu) |
|
525 | 525
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Wed 06/22 11:02 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees to July 8, 2016 - filed by Google Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 06/22 1:21 PM
SO ORDERED, re525 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google to file its Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees to July 8, 2016, filed by Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/22/2016. (nms) |