New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-06499
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
www.nychinaren.com
Plaintiff
Ziyao Jiang
4658 157 th Street
Flushing, NY 11355


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/11 12:34 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close these actions, terminate any pending motions in each action, and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, noting the mailing on the dockets. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 3/10/2025. (FV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/03 8:38 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. As Plaintiff's2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis states that as of September 10, 2024, he has $7,000 in cash, checking, or a savings account, and a house valued at $50,000, this Court finds that Plaintiff has sufficient resources to pay the $405 filing fee. Lawrence v. Comm'r of Soc. Sec., No. 22-cv-2332, 2022 WL 1782586, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. May 31, 2022). The Court also takes notice of the more detailed long form in forma pauperis application Plaintiff filed in Jiang v. Du et al, 24-cv-889, which indicated that as of June 24, 2024, Plaintiff had $21,381.42 in available funds. See Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 7, Jiang v. Du et al, 24-cv-889, ECF No. 8. To proceed, Plaintiff must pay $405 to the Clerk of Court within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days, this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 12/3/2024. (FV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
6 6 notice Notice(Other) Mon 09/23 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction filed by pro se Plaintiff Ziyao Jiang. (JVC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 notice Notice(Other) Thu 09/19 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 09/19 11:09 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification Thu 09/19 10:55 AM
Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Ziyao Jiang (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/19 10:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ziyao Jiang. (CV)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against www.nychinaren.com, filed by Ziyao Jiang. (CV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet