Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12437
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
10 10 order Dismissing Case Tue 02/18 4:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Dalton James Willard Pris. No. 896551 at Bellamy Creek Correctional Facility 1727 West Bluewater Highway, Ionia, MI 48846. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
9 9 misc Attorney Appearance - Prisoner Mediation Thu 10/24 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Darryl Turner, Zyrek for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference* Tue 10/22 12:39 PM
ORDER Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (VLun)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 10/22 1:19 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on Dalton James Willard 896551, BELLAMY CREEK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 1727 WEST BLUEWATER HIGHWAY, IONIA, MI 48846 (VLun)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 10/10 1:10 PM
ORDER granting and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $107.42 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
6 6 order Staying Case Mon 10/07 2:25 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 10/07 2:05 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $107.72 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MCho)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 10/07 2:26 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order Staying Case mailed to Dalton James Willard Pris. No. 896551 at Bellamy Creek Correctional Facility 1727 West Bluewater Highway, Ionia, MI 48846. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Fri 09/20 9:50 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
3 3 notice Mediation Program* Thu 09/19 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (DJen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 09/19 10:50 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dalton James Willard. (DJen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 09/19 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Dalton James Willard against Darryl Turner, Zyrek. (DJen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet