Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:24-cv-01046
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/24 11:40 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Court's January 10, 2025 Order. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/24/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 2/24/2025*** (dlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
11 11 7 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 10:36 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 2/10/2025 Plaintiff shall either file a long form application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit (form attached) so that the Court may determine whether he is still eligible to proceed without prepayment of the $350.00 filing fee or pay the $350 filing fee in full. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/10/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 1/10/2025*** (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
utility Address updated Wed 11/27 9:07 AM
Address updated per: D.I. 81 Notice of Change of Address in case no. 1:22-cv-00038-MN. (mrr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 misc PLRA - Authorization Form Tue 10/29 1:35 PM
Authorization by Steven Hickman requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order - PLRA for Pay Authorization ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 10/17 9:27 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice.( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/18/2024.)Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/17/2024. (oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Authorization
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
8 8 misc PLRA - Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 10/15 4:18 PM
Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Hickman (jfm)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/15 4:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Steven Hickman.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
6 6 misc Exhibit to a Document Tue 10/08 2:44 PM
EXHIBIT in support re1 Complaint - filed by Steven Hickman.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 motion Amend/Correct Tue 10/01 9:54 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct D.I.1 Complaint - filed by Steven Hickman. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order - PLRA Missing Documents Thu 09/26 11:12 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit certified trust fund account statement and IFP short form application. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/28/2024. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/26/2024. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Short Form
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 misc Exhibit to a Document Wed 09/25 2:53 PM
Amended Statement re1 Complaint - filed by Steven Hickman. (vfm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/25 11:18 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 09/19 8:35 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Prisoner 1983 Thu 09/19 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Jennifer Maddeica, Zachary S. Stirparo (No IFP, No Fee Paid) (No Civil Cover Sheet) - filed by Steven Hickman.(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Envelope