Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:24-cv-00224
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause18:1589 Forced Labor, Sex Trafficking
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Srinivas Bollepalli
Represented By
Laura Ann DeMartini
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Phillip Edward Friduss
Hall Booth Smith, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Carson Loop ESM, LLC
Represented By
Laura Ann DeMartini
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Phillip Edward Friduss
Hall Booth Smith, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
A.H.
Represented By
E. Michael Moran
Law & Moran
contact info
Jonathan Tonge
Andersen, Tate & Carr, PC
contact info
Jennifer Webster
Andersen, Tate & Carr, PC
contact info
Denise Hoying
Law & Moran
contact info
Peter A. Law
Law & Moran
contact info
Patrick J. McDonough
Andersen, Tate & Carr, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
49 49 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 05/12 12:38 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Srinivas Bollepalli filed by A.H. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
48 48 order Protective Order Wed 05/07 11:00 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/7/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
47 47 misc Proposed Consent Order Mon 05/05 10:48 AM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER Agreed Protective Order. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
46 46 discov Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 8:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re41 Certificate of Service by A.H..(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
45 45 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 03/27 6:00 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Srinivas Bollepalli filed by A.H. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann DeMartini on behalf of Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (DeMartini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
43 43 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 5:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service) (O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
42 42 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 12:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC. (O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
41 41 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/14 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service) (DeMartini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
40 40 misc Leave of Absence Thu 03/13 10:15 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/15/25 to 4/19/25, by Phillip Edward Friduss. (Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/06 6:58 PM
NOTICE by A.H. Issuance of Subpoena (Tonge, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
37 37 misc Leave of Absence Tue 03/04 8:26 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 3/5/25 to 4/2/25, by Phillip Edward Friduss.(Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura DeMartini Eschleman on behalf of Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (Eschleman, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Stalvey O'Neal on behalf of Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Srinivas Bollepalli, Carson Loop ESM, LLC (O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
33 33 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 02/05 5:08 PM
Initial Disclosures by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 02/05 3:52 PM
Initial Disclosures by A.H..(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Leave of Absence Wed 02/05 12:21 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/4/25 to 3/4/25, by Phillip Edward Friduss. (Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/05 9:39 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to File anonymously. The Court hereby ORDERS that all material, documents, pleadings, exhibits and evidence of any kind filed in this case shall refer to Plaintiff as A.H., with no other additional identifying information. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/4/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
29 29 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Tue 02/04 2:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendants'10 Motion to Set Aside Default. Plaintiff's8 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/4/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 misc Leave of Absence Mon 02/03 11:29 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 1/31/25 to 2/14/25, by Phillip Edward Friduss. (Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
27 27 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/29 11:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re26 Notice (Other) by A.H..(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/28 6:45 PM
NOTICE by A.H. of Issuance of Subpoenas (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 misc Leave of Absence Fri 01/24 3:30 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/24/25 to 3/3/25, by Phillip Edward Friduss. (Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/24 11:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:22 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/11/2025. Summary judgment Motions due by 8/11/2025 and if no summary judgment motions are filed, the Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2025. However, if a Motion for Summary Judgment is filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/24/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Thu 01/23 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.H..(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 01/23 4:24 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by A.H.. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 misc Leave of Absence Wed 01/15 5:08 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 10, 2025 up and through March 14, 2025, April 7, 2025 up and through April 11, 2025, April 18, 2025, April 21, 2025, July 3, 2025, and July 7, 2025 up and through July 11, 2025, by Peter A. Law. (Law, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
20 20 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 01/07 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2025. The Court Orally granted the2 MOTION for Protective Order and will enter a separate order. Court heard argument on10 MOTION to Set Aside Default and8 MOTION for Default Judgment. Court will set aside the default and will enter a written order. (Court Reporter Keisha Crump)(jpa)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/07 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Kent Bates by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli re18 Reply Brief,(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kent Bates
18 18 respm Reply Brief Tue 01/07 12:19 PM
REPLY BRIEF re10 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sri Bollepalli (II),
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Sara Kenney,
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Kent Bates,
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Jacob Stalvey O'Neal
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 01/02 2:24 PM
Submission of8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Carson Loop ESM, LLC and Srinivas Bollepalli ,10 MOTION to Set Aside Default , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 12/26 4:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by A.H.. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/26 4:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by A.H..(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - Declaration of Denise Hoying,
Att: 2 Ex. B - Emails
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/26 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Webster on behalf of A.H. (Webster, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 12/23 8:15 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2025 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Each side shall submit prior to the start of the hearing, a proposed order which includes findings of fact and conclusions of law for each motion being heard. Orders should be submitted by email. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/20/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Edward Friduss on behalf of Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli (Friduss, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/11 8:40 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli. Discovery ends on 5/12/2025.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/11 8:39 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Carson Loop ESM, LLC and Srinivas Bollepalli filed by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
10 10 motion Set Aside Default Wed 12/11 8:37 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli.(O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Sri Bollepalli,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Proposed Answer
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 8:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Stalvey O'Neal on behalf of Carson Loop ESM, LLC, Srinivas Bollepalli (O'Neal, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/09 12:46 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Carson Loop ESM, LLC and Srinivas Bollepalli with Brief In Support by A.H.. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
utility Clerks Entry of Default Fri 12/06 8:44 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Carson Loop ESM, LLC (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Entry of Default Fri 12/06 8:52 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Srinivas Bollepalli (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 12/05 10:34 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by A.H.. (Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Wed 10/30 4:54 PM
Return of Service Executed by A.H.. All Defendants.(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 09/19 12:24 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Carson Loop ESM, LLC. (dob)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 09/19 12:22 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Srinivas Bollepalli. (dob)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/19 12:21 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.H.. (dob)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Protective Order Leave to File Document Thu 09/19 12:19 PM
MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymouslyby A.H..(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by A.H.. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC13732078)(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 09/19 12:25 PM
Submission of2 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Leave to File to Proceed Anonymously, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (dob)
Related: [-]