Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00391
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Antonio Arce Martinez (1)
Represented By
Cesar A Armenta
contact info
Eddie D Valdez
Ed D Valdez & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Stephen C Hoch
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 3:28 AM CDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez (1). (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
3 3 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
4 4 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Sebastian Lantos as to dft Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER that Sebastian Lantos is appointed as interpreter for dft Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/23/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING OUT OF COURT INTERPRETER as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/23/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez held on 8/23/2024. Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Examination set for 8/27/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Dft remanded to custody of USM pending Preliminary and Detention Hearing. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Eddie Valdez as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/23/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/23/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
10 10 DPPA-ORDER as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/23/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/27/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
12 12 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eddie D Valdez appearing for Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez (Valdez, Eddie) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
13 13 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cesar A Armenta appearing for Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez (Armenta, Cesar) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
14 14 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 8/23/2024 within the Western District of Oklahoma by DEA in case as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
16 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Detention Hearing waived on 8/27/2024. Preliminary Hearing held on 8/27/2024. Dft remanded to the custody of the USM pending trial. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Jose Antonio Arce-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/27/2024. (cps) [5:24-mj-00642-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
19 19 INDICTMENT as to Jose Antonio Arce Martinez (1) count(s) 1. (naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Jose Antonio Arce Martinez