Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00495
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 2:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Maria Celeste Espinoza (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Humberto Yzaguirre, Jr
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Angel Castro
Office Of U S Attorney
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 3:44 AM CDT
Monday, September 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Celeste Espinoza (1), filed. (Cameron) (mp1) (dar1). [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Maria Celeste Espinoza arrested on 9/1/2024, filed. (mp1) (dar1). (dar1). [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/3/2024) Unredacted attachment
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 9/3/2024 as to Maria Celeste Espinoza. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant examined by U.S. Probation Office. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. After review of Defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel. The Court appoints counsel to represent the Defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 9/6/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. Defendant held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 9/6/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Angel Castro, AUSA; Art Vasquez f/deft, AFPD (USPO: J Hernandez) (ERO: M Perez) (Interpreter: M Hanson) (DUSM: Y De la Rosa) (CSO: S Rivera) (als1)(9:37-9:55AM)[1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Humberto Yzaguirre, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. (Yzaguirre, Humberto) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Maria Celeste Espinoza ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Maria Celeste Espinoza ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Angel Castro appearing for USA, filed. (Castro, Angel) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. (als1) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. (Yzaguirre, Humberto) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Maria Celeste Espinoza in the case of Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. (Yzaguirre, Humberto) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Maria Celeste Espinoza ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (dar1) [1:24-mj-00497]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Maria Celeste Espinoza (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (dlr1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
11 11 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Maria Celeste Espinoza, filed. (dlr1)
Related: [-]