Maryland District Court
Judge:Brendan Abell Hurson
Case #: 1:24-cv-02715
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:01 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Meadows Design & Build Inc.
Represented By
John Terrance Brennan
The Brennan Law Firm LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
David Ren Huntt
Represented By
Kevin Michael Finson
Fns Law Group
contact info
Andrew G. Balashov
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lindsay Keiser Meadows
3559 Patuxent River Road
Davidsonville, MD 21035
Represented By
John Terrance Brennan
The Brennan Law Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Meadows Design & Build Inc.
Represented By
John Terrance Brennan
The Brennan Law Firm LLC
contact info
Movant
MELEHY & ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By
Andrew G. Balashov
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Ren Huntt
Represented By
Kevin Michael Finson
Fns Law Group
contact info
Andrew G. Balashov
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J.D.H
Represented By
Kevin Michael Finson
Fns Law Group
contact info
Andrew G. Balashov
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 order Order Mon 04/28 5:43 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving29 Status Report filed by Lindsay Keiser Meadows. The Court notes that a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/30/2025 at 10:00 a.m. See ECF 27. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 4/28/2025. (cs10, Chambers)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report of the Parties by Lindsay Keiser Meadows(Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
28 28 motion Appear Wed 04/23 7:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Entry of Co-Counsel by David Ren Huntt(Sherwood, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
27 27 4 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 01/22 9:28 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 5/30/2025 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 1/21/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 12/27 4:40 PM
ANSWER to14 Counterclaim by David Ren Huntt.(Finson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
25 25 order Order Thu 12/19 5:50 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Counterclaim filed by David Ren Huntt. The deadline for Plaintiff is extended until December 27, 2024. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/19/2024. (cs10, Chambers)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/19 1:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Attorneys Andrew G. Balashov and Omar Vincent Melehy terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/19/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
23 23 3 pgs respoth Response in Opposition Thu 12/19 11:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to January 7, 2025. by Meadows Design & Build Inc., Lindsay Keiser Meadows.(Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/19 10:18 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiffs by MELEHY & ASSOCIATES LLC(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Michael Finson on behalf of David Ren Huntt, J.D.H (Finson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Wed 12/18 9:24 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Defendants to provide a position on19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Counterclaim Until January 7, 2025 filed by David Ren Huntt BY TOMORROW, THURSDAY, DECEMBER 19, AT NOON. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/18/2024. (nd4s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 6:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Counterclaim Until January 7, 2025 by David Ren Huntt(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 05, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/05 12:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin for mediation. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/5/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/05 11:46 AM
MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/5/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/5/2024 (dass)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/05 11:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due 4/28/25. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
16 16 misc Jury Demand Tue 11/26 9:37 PM
Jury Trial Demand by Meadows Design & Build Inc., Lindsay Keiser Meadows(Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/26 7:57 PM
MOTION Joint Initial Status Report and Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order by 60 Days by David Ren Huntt(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 cmp Counterclaim Tue 11/26 4:35 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against David Ren Huntt, filed by Meadows Design & Build Inc..(Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Comparison of original and amended answers
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
13 13 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 3:03 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Meadows Design & Build Inc., Lindsay Keiser Meadows (Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 order Order Wed 11/13 10:28 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's request at9 Notice (Other) filed by David Ren Huntt, J.D.H, to withdraw ECF6 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendant Meadows Design & Build Inc. filed by David Ren Huntt, J.D.H.. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 11/13/2024. (cs10, Chambers)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 7:55 AM
LETTER ORDER outlining informal discovery dispute procedure. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 11/12/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 7:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/27/2025. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 11/12/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/12 3:02 PM
NOTICE by David Ren Huntt, J.D.H re6 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendant Meadows Design & Build Inc. of Withdrawal of Motion (Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 11:29 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Meadows Design & Build Inc..(Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Terrance Brennan on behalf of Meadows Design & Build Inc., Lindsay Keiser Meadows (Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 11/12 11:48 AM
Deficiency Notice to Defendant Meadows Design & Build Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/19/2024 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
6 6 motion Default - Clerk's Entry of Mon 11/11 11:33 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendant Meadows Design & Build Inc. by David Ren Huntt, J.D.H(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/07 2:26 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/05 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Lindsay Keiser Meadows.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice EDSS Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Tue 11/05 3:49 PM
Documents submitted via EDSS. Lindsay Keiser Meadows consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 11/05 4:00 PM
QC NOTICE re:4 Answer to Complaint filed by Pro Se Defendant Lindsay Keiser Meadows on behalf of herself and Meadows Design & Build Inc. **Pursuant to Local Rule 101.1 all parties other than individuals must be represented by counsel. Therefore, the 4 Answer to Complaint is filed as to the individual Defendant Lindsay Keiser Meadows. An attorney must file an Answer for Defendant Meadows Design & Build Inc. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef to Pro Se Plaintiff)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/22 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ren Huntt, J.D.H. Meadows Design & Build Inc. served on 10/15/2024, answer due 11/5/2024.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 2:13 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Lindsay Keiser Meadows, Meadows Design & Build Inc..(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11500925.), filed by David Ren Huntt.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons